City of El Monte et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through El Monte City Attorney Rick Olivarez, City of El Monte and The People of The State of California
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., JONATHAN D SACKLER, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Mallinckrodt, PLC, Actavis plc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., THERESA SACKLER, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC,, IRENE SACKLER LEFCOURT, Actavis Pharma, Inc., MORTIMER D.A SACKLER, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., ALLERGAN, INC.,, DAVID A SACKLER, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, KATHE A. SACKLER, ACTAVIS LLC; ALLERGAN PLC, RICHARD S SACKLER, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Richard S. Sackler, Does 1-10, inclusive, Allergan, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Actavis LLC, Allergan plc, Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Johnson and Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Jonathan D. Sackler
Petitioner: ALLERGAN FINANCE, LLC, F/K/A/ ACTAVIS, INC., F/K/A WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03588
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER VACATING CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDERS AND VACATING THE JULY 25, 2019, HEARING SESSION ORDER by John Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (iv)
July 2, 2019 Filing 41 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 19SCTV10532, acknowledged on 6/21/2019. (iv)
June 18, 2019 Filing 40 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
June 18, 2019 Filing 39 STATEMENT OF DECISION by Judge John F. Walter. El Monte's Motion to Remand is GRANTED. (iv)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND [filed 5/24/2019; Docket No. #24 ]; ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DISTRIBUTOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING LIKELY TRANSFER TO MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION [filed 5/23/2019; Docket No. #23 ] by Judge John F. Walter. The Court finds that these matters are appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for June 24, 2018 is hereby vacated and the matters are taken off calendar. After considering the moving, opposing, and reply papers, and the arguments therein, the Court rules as follows: For the reasons stated in Plaintiffs' moving and reply papers, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. This action is hereby REMANDED to Los Angeles County Superior Court. Distributor Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation is DENIED as moot. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (iv)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR JOINT STIPULATION TO VACATE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND JOINT REPORT DEADLINES #34 by Judge John F. Walter. The Scheduling Conference set for July 1, 2019 is continued to August 5, 2019 at 1:15 p.m, and the deadline to file a Joint Report is continued to July 22, 2019. (iv)
June 14, 2019 Filing 36 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 100, inclusive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 13, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY filed by Defendant Insys Therapeutics, Inc.. as to INSYS THERAPEUTICS, INC., Bankruptcy Court case number 19-11292 (KG). (Azlin, Kristina)
June 13, 2019 Filing 34 Joint STIPULATION to Vacate Scheduling Conference and Joint Report Deadlines Pursuant to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #15 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shafroth, Nathan)
June 12, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation #23 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #14 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Statement of Decision)(Messenger, Lucas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation #23 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Statement of Decision)(Shafroth, Nathan)
June 12, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #24 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Statement of Decision)(Shafroth, Nathan)
June 12, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #14 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Statement of Decision)(Messenger, Lucas)
June 11, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by miscellaneous California Attorney General's Office. (Burkart, Michiyo)
June 10, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY in support of a motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation #23 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth in Support ot Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1 in Support of Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth)(Shafroth, Nathan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #24 filed by Plaintiffs City of El Monte, The People of The State of California. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Remand)(Messenger, Lucas)
June 3, 2019 Filing 26 OPPOSITION OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #24 filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth in Support of Distributor Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Shafroth, Nathan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 25 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation #23 filed by Plaintiffs City of El Monte, The People of The State of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lucas A. Messenger In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Stay, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibits A-M to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit N to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibits O-P to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibits Q-R to Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibits S-Y to Request for Judicial Notice)(Messenger, Lucas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs City of El Monte, The People of The State of California. Motion set for hearing on 6/24/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order) (Messenger, Lucas)
May 23, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 6/24/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth, #2 Exhibit No. 1 to Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth, #3 Exhibit No. 2 to Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth, #4 Exhibit No. 3 to Decklaration of Nathan E. Shafroth, #5 Exhibit No. 4 to Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth, #6 Exhibit No 5. to Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth, #7 Exhibit No. 6 to Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth, #8 Exhibit No. 7 to Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth, #9 Exhibit No. 8 to Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth) (Shafroth, Nathan)
May 20, 2019 Filing 22 STATEMENT Regarding Local Rule 7-3 Pre-Filing Conference on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Geibelson, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Filing 21 STATEMENT Regarding Local Rule 7-3 Pre-Filing Conference on Distributor Defendants' Motion to Stay filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Shafroth, Nathan)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT #10 by Judge John F. Walter. Defendants shall have through and including 30 days after the later of (1) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, if one is filed, or (2) the entry of a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action (or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action to the MDL), to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (iv)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT #8 by Judge John F. Walter. The signatory Defendants shall have through and including 30 days after the later of (1) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, if one is filed, or (2) the entry of a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action (or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action to the MDL), to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (iv)
May 13, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Michael A. Geibelson as Lead Trial Counsel re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiffs City of El Monte, The People of The State of California. (Geibelson, Michael)
May 10, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Nathan E. Shafroth Re: Compliance With Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Shafroth, Nathan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 16 Text Entry Order: Denying MOTION to Remand #12 without prejudice to refiling in accordance with the Court's Standing Order #14 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 1, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before June 17, 2019. (iv)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Of Pendency Of Other Action Or Proceeding filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Shafroth, Nathan)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs City of El Monte, The People of The State of California. Motion set for hearing on 6/10/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order) (Messenger, Lucas)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents, #2 State Court Docket - Part 1, #3 State Court Docket - Part 2, #4 State Court Docket - Part 3)(Shafroth, Nathan)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Attorney for Specially Appearing Defendants Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan plc, Allergan, Inc., ALLERGAN FINANCE, LLC, F/K/A/ ACTAVIS, INC., F/K/A WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER FOR JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION)(Attorney Ashley Elizabeth Neglia added to party Allergan plc(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Elizabeth Neglia added to party Allergan, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Elizabeth Neglia added to party ALLERGAN FINANCE, LLC, F/K/A/ ACTAVIS, INC., F/K/A WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.(pty:bkmov))(Neglia, Ashley)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ashley Elizabeth Neglia on behalf of Defendant Allergan USA, Inc. (Attorney Ashley Elizabeth Neglia added to party Allergan USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Neglia, Ashley)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shafroth, Nathan)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-03588 JFW(PLAx). (rn)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (esa)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on April 30, 2019. (Shafroth, Nathan)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation (Shafroth, Nathan)
April 29, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis plc, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan plc, Allergan, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Does 1-100, inclusive, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Irene Sackler Lefcourt, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiffs The People of The State of California, City of El Monte.(Filed in state court 3/28/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Van Tassell, Rebecca)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV10532 Receipt No: 0973-23641599 - Fee: $400, filed by DEFENDANT McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Attorney Rebecca Grace Van Tassell added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft))(Van Tassell, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of El Monte et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Rebecca Grace Van Tassell
Represented By: Nathan Evans Shafroth
Represented By: Raymond Gin Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN D SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERESA SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRENE SACKLER LEFCOURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTIMER D.A SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID A SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHE A. SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC; ALLERGAN PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD S SACKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Neglia
Represented By: Zachary William Byer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Neglia
Represented By: Zachary William Byer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Neglia
Represented By: Zachary William Byer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through El Monte City Attorney Rick Olivarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of El Monte
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Ricardo A Olivarez
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of The State of California
Represented By: Lucas Andrew Messenger
Represented By: Bernice Conn
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Ricardo A Olivarez
Represented By: Michael A Geibelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALLERGAN FINANCE, LLC, F/K/A/ ACTAVIS, INC., F/K/A WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Neglia
Represented By: Zachary William Byer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?