Venise Garcia et al v. Johnson and Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Venise Garcia, Salvador Garcia and JCCP Plaintiffs
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive,, Johnson and Johnson, Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc. and Johnson and Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03751
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. BC677961/JCCP 4872, acknowledged on 6/13/2019. (iv)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (bm)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The remaining thirty-two (32) removed talc actions before the Court are hereby REMANDED to state court. Any motions or ex parte applications to remand that are pending in those actions are DENIED AS MOOT, and the hearings vacated.Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (rrey)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-03036 CJC(JCx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal and Judge Otis D. Wright, II to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-03751 CJC(JCx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (rn)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Venise Garcia. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-03150 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Liakos, Jennifer)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT Rule 9027(e)(3) Statement In Opposition of Removal filed by Plaintiffs Salvador Garcia, Venise Garcia (Agnetti, Melissa)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (et)
May 1, 2019 COPY OF SECOND AMENDED MASTER COMPLAINT against Defendants Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc., Does 1 through 100, inclusive, JURY DEMAND, filed by JCCP Plaintiffs. (RECEIVED IN LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT, CASE NO.: JCCP 4872 ON 1/15/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
May 1, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Imerys Talc America, Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc., Does 1 through 100, inclusive. Jury Demand,, filed by Plaintiffs Venise Garcia, Salvador Garcia. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, CASE NUMBER BC677961 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., (Janizeh, Nicholas)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Janizeh, Nicholas)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number JCCP 4872 Receipt No: 0973-23657623 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda Villalobos, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D-Part 1, #6 Exhibit D-Part 2) (Attorney Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:dft))(Janizeh, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venise Garcia et al v. Johnson and Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Represented By: Caroline A Toole
Represented By: Emily M Weissenberger
Represented By: Amanda Villalobos
Represented By: Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh
Represented By: Michael Carl Zellers
Represented By: Alexander A Guney
Represented By: Michael F Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh
Represented By: Caroline A Toole
Represented By: Emily M Weissenberger
Represented By: Amanda Villalobos
Represented By: Michael Carl Zellers
Represented By: Alexander A Guney
Represented By: Michael F Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh
Represented By: Caroline A Toole
Represented By: Emily M Weissenberger
Represented By: Amanda Villalobos
Represented By: Michael Carl Zellers
Represented By: Alexander A Guney
Represented By: Michael F Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venise Garcia
Represented By: Melissa Anne Agnetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Garcia
Represented By: Melissa Anne Agnetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JCCP Plaintiffs
Represented By: Mark P Robinson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?