A.L. v. Temple City Unified School District
Plaintiff: A.L. a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem Elizabeth L. and A. L.
Defendant: Temple City Unified School District
Case Number: 2:2019cv03922
Filed: May 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 7/29/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , COUNTERCLAIM against A. L. filed by Defendant Temple City Unified School District.(Attorney Meagan M Kinsey added to party Temple City Unified School District(pty:dft))(Kinsey, Meagan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff A. L., upon Defendant All Defendants. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Meagan Kinsey, Attorney for Defendant Temple City Unified School District. (German, David)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 CORRECTED 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Temple City Unified School District. (mrgo)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff A. L.. Amendment to Summons Request #4 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #9 (German, David)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Application for Guardian Ad Litem by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. IT IS SO ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs Application is GRANTED; 2. Elizabeth L. is appointed guardian ad litem of A.L. in this action and shall prosecute it on his behalf. re Sealed Document, #11 (vm)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT re EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document Application for Guardian ad Litem under seal #5 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #10 filed by Plaintiff A. L.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Ex Parte Application for Appointment of Guardian ad Litem, #2 Proposed Order)(German, David)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Ex Parte Application to file Under Seal: 1. Ex Parte Application for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for A.L.; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Consent to Serve of Elizabeth L. by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Order for details) #5 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Seal Document (vm)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Temple City Unified School District. (et)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document Application for Guardian ad Litem under seal #5 filed by Plaintiff A.L. a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem Elizabeth L.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(German, David)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document Application for Guardian ad Litem under seal filed by Plaintiff A.L. a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem Elizabeth L.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. German pursuant to 7-19.1, #2 Declaration of David W. German in Support of Filing Document Under Seal, #3 Redacted Document Application for Guardian ad Litem A.L., #4 Proposed Order)(German, David)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff A.L. a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem Elizabeth L.. (German, David)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff A.L. a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem Elizabeth L., (German, David)
May 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff A.L. a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem Elizabeth L.. (German, David)
May 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23679305 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff A.L. a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem Elizabeth L.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Decision) (Attorney David Ward German added to party A.L. a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem Elizabeth L.(pty:pla))(German, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.L. v. Temple City Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temple City Unified School District
Represented By: Sarah L W Sutherland
Represented By: Meagan M Kinsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.L. a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem Elizabeth L.
Represented By: David Ward German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. L.
Represented By: David Ward German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?