RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC. v. GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC
Plaintiff: Radio Music License Committee, Inc
Defendant: Global Music Rights, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv03957
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Referring Judge: Ronald SW Lew
2 Judge: Alka Sagar
3 Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0002
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, re Stipulation to Exceed Page Limitation #164 . The Court has read the stipulation and hereby DENIES said stipulation that exceeds the 25-page limit. (shb)
July 2, 2019 Filing 164 STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Supporting And Opposition Briefs To Rule 12 Motions filed by Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petrocelli, Daniel)
June 20, 2019 Filing 163 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC amending Amended Complaint #52 , filed by Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc(Zwisler, Margaret)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. The parties shall file a joint report no later than seven(7) days after the ADR proceeding regarding the progress of settlement discussions. (shb)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER ON THE PARTIES STIPULATED INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT PROPOSAL #156 , by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS the following dates for initial briefing and for any trial(s): RMLC Complaint and GMRO Complaint: Joint Rule 26(f) conference due May 30, 2019. RMLC Complaint: RMLC files Second Amended Complaint, unopposed by GMRO due Within 5 business days after Courtsentry of order approving the Stipulation to File a Second Amended Complaint,which shall be filed simultaneous. See order for further details. (shb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 160 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc(Zwisler, Margaret)
June 13, 2019 Filing 159 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc.. (Zwisler, Margaret)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE INCS FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, #157 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. Based upon the Stipulation of the parties, and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2), the Court hereby orders that Radio Music License Committee, Inc. shall file its Second Amended Complaint within five (5) business days of the entry of this Order. (shb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 157 STIPULATION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Gass, Andrew)
June 3, 2019 Filing 156 STATUS REPORT (The Parties' Joint Status Report And Stipulated Case Management Proposal) filed by Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Petrocelli, Daniel)
May 31, 2019 Filing 155 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew Michael Gass counsel for Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc. Adding Andrew M. Gass as counsel of record for Radio Music License Committee, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc.. (Attorney Andrew Michael Gass added to party Radio Music License Committee, Inc(pty:pla))(Gass, Andrew)
May 30, 2019 Filing 154 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTERThis action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. COUNSEL: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. See order for details. (shb)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Granting #146 Non-Resident Attorney Margaret M. Zwisler APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Radio Music License Committee Inc, designating Adam S. Sieff as local counsel. (shb)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Granting #145 Non-Resident Attorney David L. Johnson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Radio Music License Committee Inc, designating Adam S. Sieff as local counsel. (shb)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Granting #144 Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer L. Giordano APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Radio Music License Committee Inc, designating Adam S. Sieff as local counsel. (shb)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Granting #143 Non-Resident Attorney William M. Friedman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Radio Music License Committee Inc, designating Adam S. Sieff as local counsel. (shb)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:16-cv-09051 TJH(ASx). Case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-03957 TJH(ASx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (rn)
May 15, 2019 Filing 148 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Peter J Mooney on behalf of Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
May 15, 2019 Filing 147 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Neill C. Kling on behalf of Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt)
May 15, 2019 Filing 146 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Margaret M. Zwisler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23743061) filed by Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sieff, Adam)
May 15, 2019 Filing 145 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23742988) filed by Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sieff, Adam)
May 15, 2019 Filing 144 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer L. Giordano to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23742933) filed by Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sieff, Adam)
May 15, 2019 Filing 143 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William M. Friedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23742821) filed by Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sieff, Adam)
May 15, 2019 Filing 142 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Adam S Sieff counsel for Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc. Adding Adam S. Sieff as counsel of record for Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc.. (Attorney Adam S Sieff added to party Radio Music License Committee, Inc(pty:pla))(Sieff, Adam)
May 14, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC. Related Case(s): 2:16-cv-9051-TJH-AS (Petrocelli, Daniel)
May 13, 2019 Filing 140 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Edward Hassi on behalf of Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Not appearing as an attorney of record in this case. (You will be removed as an attorney of record from the docket.) (ak)
May 13, 2019 Filing 139 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Richard George Parker on behalf of Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Not appearing as an attorney of record in this case. (You will be removed as an attorney of record from the docket.) (ak)
May 13, 2019 Filing 138 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Neill C Kling on behalf of Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due or Order. PHV fee N/A. Not appearing as an attorney of record in this case. (You will be removed as an attorney of record from the docket.) (ak)
May 13, 2019 Filing 137 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney John G Harkins, JR on behalf of Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due or Order. PHV fee N/A. Not appearing as an attorney of record in this case. (You will be removed as an attorney of record from the docket.) (ak)
May 13, 2019 Filing 136 Notice of Electronic Filing re Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,, #128 e-mailed to Richard George Parker bounced due to invalid email address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 13, 2019 Filing 135 NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING Re Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) #127 , and documents 125 through 134 e-mailed to ehassi@omm.com bounced due to 550 5.1.10 RESOLVER.ADR.Recipient Not Found; Recipient not found by SMTP address lookup. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (nhac) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 10, 2019 Filing 134 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Katrina M Robson counsel for Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC. Adding Katrina Robson as counsel of record for Global Music Rights, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC. (Attorney Katrina M Robson added to party Global Music Rights, LLC(pty:dft))(Robson, Katrina)
May 10, 2019 Filing 133 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen McIntyre counsel for Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC. Adding Stephen McIntyre as counsel of record for Global Music Rights, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC. (Attorney Stephen McIntyre added to party Global Music Rights, LLC(pty:dft))(McIntyre, Stephen)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-03957 AB(SSx). (rn)
May 9, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Neill C Kling. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John G Harkins, Jr. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard George Parker. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Edward Hassi. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney William L Friedman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Peter J Mooney. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Margaret M Zwisler. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer L Giordano. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David L Johnson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 2:16-cv-06076-CDJ, from Eastern District of Pennsylvania. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:19-cv-03957 RSWL (SSx). (esa)
May 7, 2019 Filing 118 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Pennsylvania Eastern
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ARE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. "SECTION E" OF THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IS STRICKEN AND THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IS OTHERWISE APPROVED AND ADOPTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS LLC'S MOTION TO STRIKE IS GRANTED. RADIO MUSIC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. RADIO MUSIC'S SECOND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IS DENIED. GLOBAL MUSIC'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THIS CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE USDC FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL AND ALL OTHER PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 3/29/19. 4/1/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON/29/19. 4/1/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 115 RESPONSE in Opposition re #114 MOTION For Leave to Supplement the Jurisdictional Record with Additional Facts filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PETROCELLI, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 114 MOTION For Leave to Supplement the Jurisdictional Record with Additional Facts filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Memorandum; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS FOR TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE OR STATUS REPORT IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/4/19.1/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 112 RESPONSE to Motion re #110 MOTION For Telephonic Status Conference Or Status Report filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC.. (ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 111 Declaration re #110 MOTION For Telephonic Status Conference Or Status Report (Declaration Of David Marroso In Support Of Defendant's Motion For Telephonic Status Conference Or Status Report) by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(PETROCELLI, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 110 MOTION For Telephonic Status Conference Or Status Report filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.Memorandum, Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PETROCELLI, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 109 MOTION for Telephonic Status Conference filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PETROCELLI, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS FOR TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCES (DOC NOS 97,107) ARE DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 5/18/18.5/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 107 MOTION for Telephonic Status Conference filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PETROCELLI, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 12, 2018 Filing 106 RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC. REPLY IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER THAT RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IS GRANTED AND THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS HEREBY DIRECTED TO ACCEPT FOR FILING RMLC'S REPLY BRIEF. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/10/18. 1/12/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 5, 2018 Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Memorandum, Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Motion - Reply)(ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 27, 2017 Filing 103 Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC's Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Report and Recommendation on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Venue #101 re #100 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGH filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC. (PETROCELLI, DANIEL) Modified on 12/28/2017 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 102 ***(Court Only) Civ624 Notice to the Court regarding Report and Recommendation.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 13, 2017 Filing 101 Objections by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC. re #100 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGH . (ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
November 29, 2017 Filing 100 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC, #90 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC. OBJECTIONS TO R&R DUE BY 12/13/2017. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 11/29/2017. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED ORDER, #2 NOTICE) 11/29/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE OR TO TRANSFER VENUE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/28/17. 11/29/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
November 14, 2017 Filing 98 Joinder to Plaintiff Radio Music License Committee, Inc.'s Motion for Telephonic Status Conference filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PETROCELLI, DANIEL) Modified on 11/15/2017 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 97 MOTION for Telephonic Status Conference filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF WILLIAM M. FRIEDMAN, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/14/17. 9/15/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ELYSE M. GREENWALD, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 9/14/17. 9/15/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
September 14, 2017 Filing 94 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of William M. Friedman ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12327076.) filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Certificate of Service.(MOONEY, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
September 14, 2017 Filing 93 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Elyse M. Greenwald ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12327039.) filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Certificate of Service.(MOONEY, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Filing 92 RESPONSE in Opposition re #90 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Marroso, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of David Marroso, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of David Marroso, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of David Marroso, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of David Marroso, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of David Marroso, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of David Marroso, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of David Marroso, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of David Marroso, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of David Marroso, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of David Marroso, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of David Marroso, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of David Marroso, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of David Marroso, #15 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of David Marroso, #16 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of David Marroso, #17 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of David Marroso, #18 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of David Marroso, #19 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of David Marroso, #20 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of David Marroso, #21 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of David Marroso, #22 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of David Marroso, #23 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of David Marroso, #24 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of David Marroso, #25 Exhibit 24 to Declaration of David Marroso, #26 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of David Marroso, #27 Exhibit 26 to Declaration of David Marroso, #28 Exhibit 27 to Declaration of David Marroso, #29 Exhibit 28 to Declaration of David Marroso, #30 Exhibit 29 to Declaration of David Marroso, #31 Exhibit 30 to Declaration of David Marroso, #32 Exhibit 31 to Declaration of David Marroso, #33 Exhibit 32 to Declaration of David Marroso, #34 Text of Proposed Order)(PETROCELLI, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 91 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by WILLIAM J RINNER on behalf of RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC.(RINNER, WILLIAM) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
August 14, 2017 Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Global Music Rights, LLCs Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #6 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #7 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #8 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #9 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #10 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #11 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #12 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #13 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #14 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #15 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #16 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #17 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #18 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #19 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #20 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano, #21 Exhibit C - Declaration of John Verstandig, #22 Exhibit D - Declaration of William Velez (Part 1), #23 Exhibit D - Declaration of William Velez (Part 2), #24 Exhibit E - Declaration of Eugene D. Levin, #25 Text of Proposed Order)(ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
August 2, 2017 Filing 89 Minute Entry for Pretrial Conference held on 8/1/17 before Judge Jones. (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION.SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 8/1/17. 8/1/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
July 21, 2017 Filing 87 Declaration re #85 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , Declaration of William Velez by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
July 21, 2017 Filing 86 Declaration re #85 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , Declaration of Jennifer L. Giordano by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
July 21, 2017 Filing 85 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Memorandum, Declarations and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Declaration of John Verstandig, #3 Declaration of Dave Paulus, #4 Declaration of Steven R. Peterson, #5 Declaration of Jim Coloff, #6 Declaration of Eugene D. Levin, #7 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Eugene D. Levin, #8 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Eugene D. Levin, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TO TRANSFER VENUE IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/8/17. 6/8/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL IS GRANTED. THE DECLARATION OF JOHN VERSTANDIG, EXHIBITS 1-4 TO THE DECLARATION OF JOHN VERSTANDIG AND RMLC'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE OR TO TRANSFER VENUE ARE HEREBY SEALED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 4/24/17. 4/25/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS A, B AND C TO THE MARCH 3, 2017 DECLARATION OF DAVID MARROSO THERETO ARE SEALED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 4/24/17. 4/25/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE SPECIFIED IMPROPER ALLEGATION S FROM PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSOANL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER VENUE, THE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF RANDY GRIMMETT AND EXHIBITS B, D AND V THERETO AND THE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DAVID MARROSO AND EXHIBITS A THROUGH J ARE SEALED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 4/17/17. 4/18/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
April 17, 2017 Filing 80 Defendant GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLCs Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
April 17, 2017 Filing 79 Defendant GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLCs Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Specified Improper Allegations from First Amended Complaint. (mbh, ) (Main Document 79 replaced on 4/18/2017) (mbh, ). (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER #81) Modified on 4/18/2017 (mbh, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
April 17, 2017 Filing 78 Defendant GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLCs Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, in the alternative, To Transfer Venue.(mbh, )(FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER #81) Modified on 4/18/2017 (mbh, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE THE REPLY BRIEF AS ATTACHED TO ITS MOTION (DOC NO 69). DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE SPECIFIED IMPROPER ALLEGATIONS FROM PLAINTIFF;S AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE THE REPLY BRIEF AS ATTACHED TO ITS MOTION (DOC NO 70). DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE THE REPLY BRIEF AS ATTACHED TO ITS MOTION (DOC NO 71). SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 4/17/17. 4/18/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
April 10, 2017 Filing 76 Supplemental Declaration of Randy Grimmett in Support of Defendant's (1) Motion to Strike and (2) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue and Exhibits B,D and through R and V. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2017: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K, #10 Exhibit L) (fb). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2017: #11 Exhibit M, #12 Exhibit N, #13 Exhibit O, #14 Exhibit P, #15 Exhibit Q, #16 Exhibit R, #17 Exhibit V) (fb). Modified on 4/12/2017 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
April 10, 2017 Filing 75 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DAVID MARROSO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S (1) MOTION TO STRIKE AND (2) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE OR TO TRANSFER VENUE AND EXHIBITS A THROUGH J. (FILED UNDER SEAL) GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC. (mbh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2017: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (fb). Modified on 4/12/2017 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
April 10, 2017 Filing 74 Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Strike Specified Improper Allegations from Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint - Exhibit 1 (FILED UNDER SEAL) (mbh, ) (fb). Modified on 4/12/2017 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
April 10, 2017 Filing 73 Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue - Exhibit 1 (FILED UNDER SEAL) (mbh, ) (fb). Modified on 4/12/2017 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
April 10, 2017 Filing 72 Praecipe to Substitute the Attached Corrected Exhibits 2 and 3 to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue and Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Strike Specified Improper Allegations from Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibit 2-Declaration of David Marroso (complete), #2 Corrected Exhibit 3-Declaration of Randy Grimmett Part 1 (complete), #3 Corrected Exhibit 3-Declaration of Randy Grimmitt Part 2 (complete))(KLING, NEILL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
April 7, 2017 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief In Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.Memorandum, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Motion - Reply, #4 Exhibit 2 to the Motion - Appendix A to the Reply, #5 Certificate of Service)(PETROCELLI, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
April 7, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief In Support of Defendant's Motion to Strike Specified Improper Allegations from Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.Memorandum, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Motion - Reply, #4 Exhibit 2 to the Motion - Marroso Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to the Motion - Grimmett Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to the Motion - Appendix A to the Reply, #7 Certificate of Service)(PETROCELLI, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
April 7, 2017 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.Memorandum, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Motion - Reply, #4 Exhibit 2 to the Motion - Marroso Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to the Motion - Grimmett Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to the Motion - Appendix A to the Reply, #7 Certificate of Service)(PETROCELLI, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
April 7, 2017 Filing 68 MOTION to Seal Document (Motion for Leave to File Replies In Support of Motions to Strike and Dismiss, Supplemental Marroso and Grimmett Declarations, and Exhibits Thereto Under Seal) filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.Memorandum, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(PETROCELLI, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 67 Unredacted copy of Radio Music License Committee, Inc's Opposition to Global Music Rights LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, Unredacted copy of Declaration of John Verstandig, Unredacted copies of Exhibits 1 1-4 to Declaration of John Verstandig. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(mbh, ) (fb). Modified on 3/27/2017 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 65 Declaration re #63 Response in Opposition to Motion, #62 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Declaration of William Velez by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 6 (Redacted), #7 Exhibit 7 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 64 Declaration re #63 Response in Opposition to Motion, #62 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Declaration of Alfred C. Pfeiffer by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 MOTION to Strike / Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC's Motion to Strike Specified Improper Allegations from First Amended Complaint filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Verstandig (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 4 (Redacted), #6 Declaration of Eugene C. Levin, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 61 MOTION to Seal Declaration of John Verstandig, Exhibits 1-4 to Declaration of John Verstandig, and RMLC Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Memorandum, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Seal Declaration of John Verstandig, Exhibits 1-4 to Declaration of John Verstandig, and RMLC Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
March 6, 2017 Filing 60 Defendant, GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC's, Exhibits A, B and C to the March 3, 2017 Declaration of David Marroso.(mbh,). (FILED UNDER SEAL) (fb). Modified on 3/6/2017 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
March 3, 2017 Filing 59 Declaration re #56 MOTION to Strike / Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC's Motion to Strike Specified Improper Allegations from First Amended Complaint, #57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue, #58 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM / Declaration of David Marroso by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Certificate of Service)(MARROSO, DAVID) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
March 3, 2017 Filing 58 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(PETROCELLI, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
March 3, 2017 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or to Transfer Venue filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit A to the Memorandum of Law in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PETROCELLI, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
March 3, 2017 Filing 56 MOTION to Strike / Defendant Global Music Rights, LLC's Motion to Strike Specified Improper Allegations from First Amended Complaint filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Exhibit A to the Memorandum of Law in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PETROCELLI, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
March 3, 2017 Filing 55 MOTION to Seal (Motion for Leave To File Exhibits A, B, and C to the March 3, 2017 Declaration of David Marroso Under Seal) filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.Memorandum Of Law, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A - REDACTED, #5 Exhibit B - REDACTED, #6 Exhibit C - REDACTED)(PETROCELLI, DANIEL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL FILE ANY MOTIONS UNDER RULE 12 ON 3/3/17. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BY 4/7/17. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 2/27/17. 2/28/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
February 20, 2017 Filing 53 Consent MOTION to Establish Briefing Schedule (Joint) filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
February 10, 2017 Filing 52 First Amended Complaint against GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC., Certificate of Service.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 20, 2017 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss or to Transfer Venue filed by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.Memorandum of Law in Support, Declaration of Randy Grimmett in Support, Declaration of David Marroso in Support, Proposed Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Randy Grimmett, #3 Declaration of David Marroso, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(MARROSO, DAVID) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 19, 2017 Filing 50 ***(Court Only) Civ624 Notice to the Court regarding Report and Recommendation.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL FILE ITS MOTION TO DISMISS BY 1/20/17. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BY 3/3/17. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/17/17. 1/18/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 13, 2017 Filing 48 Joint MOTION to Establish Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER THAT BY 1/17/17, THE PARTIES JOINTLY FILE A MOTION TO ESTABLISH THE DEADLINES FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/10/17. 1/12/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER THAT THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/9/17. 1/10/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY RICHARD PARKER ON BEHALF OF GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/6/2017. 1/6/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. ECF APP FORWARDED. (kp, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY EDWARD HASSI ON BEHALF OF GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/6/2017. 1/6/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.. (kp, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY DAVID J. MARROSO ON BEHALF OF GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/6/2017. 1/6/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. ECF APP FORWARDED. (kp, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY DANIEL M. PETROCELLI ON BEHALF OF GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 1/6/2017. 1/6/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. ECF APP FORWARDED. (kp, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 5, 2017 Filing 41 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/21/16 before Judge Lynne A. Sitarski. Court Reporter/Transcriber DIANE DOMAN TRANSCRIBING LOLC. (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER THAT THE PARTIES' JOINT CONSENT MOTION TO ESTABLISH BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 1/5/17. 1/5/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 5, 2017 Filing 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BE DENIED AS MOOT ON THE GROUNDS THAT IT HAS BEEN WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 1/5/17. 1/5/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice)(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
January 4, 2017 Filing 38 - Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Without Prejudice and Certificate of Service by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC. re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (ZWISLER, MARGARET) Modified on 1/5/2017 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 29, 2016 Filing 37 Transcript of Telephone Conference on Motion held on 12/16/16, before Magistrate Judge LYNNE A. SITARSKI. (jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 29, 2016 Filing 36 Transcript of Telephone Conference on Motion held on 12/9/16 before Magistrate Judge LYNNE A. SITARSKI.. (jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 29, 2016 Filing 35 Transcript of Telephone Conference on Motion held on 12/8/16, before Magistrate Judge LYNNE A. SITARSKI.. (jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 28, 2016 Filing 34 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Azoff MSG Entertainment LLC with Certificate of Service by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.(KLING, NEILL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 21, 2016 Filing 33 Minute Entry for Telephone Pretrial Conference held on 12/21/16 before Judge Sitarski. (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 19, 2016 Filing 32 Joint MOTION to Establish Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service.Motions referred to LYNNE A. SITARSKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ZWISLER, MARGARET) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 19, 2016 Filing 31 Minute Entry for Telephonic Pretrial Conference [On The Record] held on 12/16/16 before Judge Sitarski. (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT AN ON THE RECORD TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 12/21/16 AT 2:00 PM. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 12/19/16. 12/19/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 12, 2016 Filing 29 Minute Entry for Telephonic Pretrial Conference held on 12/9/16 before Judge Sitarski. (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT AN ON THE RECORD TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 12/16/16 AT 2:00 PM. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 12/12/16. 12/12/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 9, 2016 Filing 27 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward Hassi by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.. (KLING, NEILL) Modified on 12/13/2016 (mbh, ). (filing fee paid) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 9, 2016 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Marroso by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.. (KLING, NEILL) Modified on 12/13/2016 (mbh, ).(filing fee paid) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 9, 2016 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard Parker by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.. (KLING, NEILL) Modified on 12/13/2016 (mbh, ).(filing fee paid) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 9, 2016 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel M. Petrocelli by GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC.. (KLING, NEILL) Modified on 12/13/2016 (mbh, ).(filing fee paid) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 8, 2016 Filing 23 Minute Entry for Telephonic Pretrial Conference held on 12/8/16 before Judge Sitarski. (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT THE ON THE RECORD TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IN THIS CASE HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED FOR 12/8/16 AT 1:30 PM TO DISCUSS PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 12/6/16. 12/7/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC. (MOONEY, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF WILLIAM J. RINNER, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/6/16. 12/7/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JENNIFER L. GIORDANO, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/6/16. 12/7/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ALFRED C. PFEIFFER, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/6/16. 12/7/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MARGARET M. ZWISLER, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/6/16. 12/7/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF DAVID L. JOHNSON, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 12/6/16. 12/7/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 6, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN G. HARKINS, JR on behalf of GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC with Certificate of Service(HARKINS, JOHN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 6, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by NEILL C. KLING on behalf of GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC with Certificate of Service(KLING, NEILL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER THAT AN ON THE RECORD TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 12/7/16 AT 2:00 PM TO DISCUSS PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 12/6/16. 12/6/16 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 5, 2016 Filing 12 MOTION For Telephonic Conference to Schedule Hearing on Preliminary Injunction Motion filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Certificate of Service.Motions referred to LYNNE A. SITARSKI.(MOONEY, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
December 5, 2016 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC. (MOONEY, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
November 28, 2016 Filing 10 Praecipe to Issue Alias Summons by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC.. (MOONEY, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI FOR A HEARING AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 11/21/16. 11/23/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
November 22, 2016 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice of William J. Rinner filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Certificate of Service.(MOONEY, PETER) Modified on 11/30/2016 (nd, ). Modified on 12/5/2016 (mbh, ).(Fee paid on 12/2/16) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
November 22, 2016 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer L. Giordano filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Certificate of Service.(MOONEY, PETER) Modified on 11/30/2016 (nd, ). Modified on 12/5/2016 (mbh, ).(Fee paid on 12/2/16) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
November 22, 2016 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice of Alfred C. Pfeiffer, Jr. filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Certificate of Service.(MOONEY, PETER) Modified on 11/30/2016 (nd, ). Modified on 12/5/2016 (mbh, ).(Fee paid on 12/2/16) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
November 22, 2016 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice of Margaret M. Zwisler filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Certificate of Service.(MOONEY, PETER) Modified on 11/30/2016 (nd, ). Modified on 12/5/2016 (mbh, ).(Fee paid on 12/2/16) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
November 22, 2016 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Pro Hac Vice of David L. Johnson filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Certificate of Service.(MOONEY, PETER) Modified on 11/30/2016 (nd, ). Modified on 12/5/2016 (mbh, ). (Fee paid on 12/2/16) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
November 18, 2016 Summons Issued as to GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 11/21/16 (jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
November 18, 2016 Filing 3 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..Memorandum Of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
November 18, 2016 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]
November 18, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 150373.), filed by RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC..(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RADIO MUSIC LICENSE COMMITTEE, INC. v. GLOBAL MUSIC RIGHTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Music Rights, LLC
Represented By: David Marroso
Represented By: Daniel M Petrocelli
Represented By: Richard George Parker
Represented By: John G Harkins, JR
Represented By: Neill C Kling
Represented By: Edward Hassi
Represented By: Stephen McIntyre
Represented By: Katrina M Robson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radio Music License Committee, Inc
Represented By: Alfred C Pfeiffer, Jr
Represented By: Peter J Mooney
Represented By: William J Rinner
Represented By: Elyse Miriam Greenwald
Represented By: Margaret M Zwisler
Represented By: Jennifer L Giordano
Represented By: David L Johnson
Represented By: William M Friedman
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Adam S Sieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?