Arthur Edward Ezor v. Jackie Lacey et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Edward Ezor
Defendant: Jackie Lacey, Craig Elliott Veals, Kelly S. Howick and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04020
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's request, Dkt. No. #17 , is GRANTED. The Court sets the following briefing schedule and hearing date: 1. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss is due on or before July 11, 2019. 2. Defendants may file a reply within 14 days of service of the opposition. 3. The hearing on Defendants' motions to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint is continued from July 9, 2019 to August 6, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 550, Roybal Courthouse. (hr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST for Reasonable Continuance of Hearing of 7/9/19, and Reasonable Extension of Court Deadline to File and Serve Opposition Papers to Two Pending Motions to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Arthur Edward Ezor. (sp)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF ARTHUR EDWARD EZOR'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. RULE 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) #9 by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. The hearing date has been rescheduled. Motion set for hearing on 7/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (kl)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF ARTHUR EDWARD EZOR'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. RULE 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: 1. The hearing is incorrectly noticed on the docket for 7/9/2021. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. On May 30, 2019, Defendants filed motions to dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint. (Dkt. Nos. #7 & #9 .) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff shall file an opposition on or before June 18, 2019. 2. Defendants may file a reply within 14 days of service of the oppositions. (kl)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Erin A Chang counsel for Defendants Kelly S. Howick, Jackie Lacey. Adding Erin Chang as counsel of record for Defendants Jackie Lacey and Kelly S. Howick for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Defendants Jackie Lacey and Kelly S. Howick. (Attorney Erin A Chang added to party Kelly S. Howick(pty:dft), Attorney Erin A Chang added to party Jackie Lacey(pty:dft))(Chang, Erin)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Kelly S. Howick, Jackie Lacey, re Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #11 served on May 30, 2019. (Hurrell, Thomas)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas C Hurrell counsel for Defendants Kelly S. Howick, Jackie Lacey. Adding Thomas C. Hurrell as counsel of record for Defendants Jackie Lacey and Kelly S. Howick for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Jackie Lacey and Kelly S. Howick. (Attorney Thomas C Hurrell added to party Kelly S. Howick(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas C Hurrell added to party Jackie Lacey(pty:dft))(Hurrell, Thomas)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 DEFENDANTS JACKIE LACY AND KELLY HOWICK'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF ARTHUR EDWARD EZOR'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P RULE 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Part 1 of 2 (Attachments: #1 DEFENDANT JACKIE LACY AND KELLY HOWICK'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PART 2 OF 2)(McNulty, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF ARTHUR EDWARD EZOR'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. RULE 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Does, Kelly S. Howick, Jackie Lacey. Motion set for hearing on 7/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Attorney John Vincent McNulty added to party Does(pty:dft), Attorney John Vincent McNulty added to party Kelly S. Howick(pty:dft), Attorney John Vincent McNulty added to party Jackie Lacey(pty:dft)) (McNulty, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim for Relief #7 filed by Defendant Craig Elliott Veals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McCormick, Kevin)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim for Relief filed by defendant Craig Elliott Veals. Motion set for hearing on 7/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Attorney Kevin M McCormick added to party Craig Elliott Veals(pty:dft)) (McCormick, Kevin)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Arthur Edward Ezor. (lh)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant Kelly S. Howick. (lh)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant Craig Elliott Veals. (lh)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant Jackie Lacey. (lh)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Kelly S. Howick, Jackie Lacey, Craig Elliott Veals, Does 1 through 10. Case assigned to Judge James V. Selna and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Filing Fee $400 Paid), filed by Plaintiff Arthur Edward Ezor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arthur Edward Ezor v. Jackie Lacey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Lacey
Represented By: John Vincent McNulty
Represented By: Thomas C Hurrell
Represented By: Erin A Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Elliott Veals
Represented By: Kevin M McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly S. Howick
Represented By: John Vincent McNulty
Represented By: Thomas C Hurrell
Represented By: Erin A Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Represented By: John Vincent McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Edward Ezor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?