Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust et al v. Smith-Emery Company
Plaintiff: Contract Administration Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund and Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust
Counter Defendant: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, California Building Standards Commission, State of California, Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development, State Of California, Division of The State Architect and International Union of Operating Engineers Local Union No. 12
Counter Claimant: Smith-Emery Company and James E Partridge
Case Number: 2:2019cv04058
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
2 Judge: Frederick F Mumm
3 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MINUTES (In Chambers): Order re Defendant's Document Production by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Based on the parties' submissions, the Court makes the following additional rulings regarding Defendant's response to Plaintiff's requests for production and compliance with the February 10, 2021 order. [See document for details.] (es)
August 20, 2021 Filing 90 DECLARATION of Jim Partridge re Miscellaneous Document,, #89 Declaration of Marija Decker filed by Defendant Smith-Emery Company. (Franz, Stephen)
August 13, 2021 Filing 89 Declaration of Marija Kristich Decker Re Status Report re Document Production filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust re: Discovery Hearing,,, #88 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 thru 2)(Decker, Marija)
July 16, 2021 Filing 88 MINUTES OF DISCOVERY CONFERENCE Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Discovery conference held. No later than July 30, 2021, plaintiffs' counsel shall send defendant's counsel a letter outlying plaintiffs' issues regarding defendant's declaration as to completion of document production. No later than August 6, 2021, counsel from the two sides shall meet and confer regarding these issues. If all disputes have not been resolved, plaintiffs' counsel shall file a statement regarding the results of the meet and confer process and plaintiff's position on these issues no later than August 13, 2021. Within one week of the filing of the plaintiffs' statement, defendant shall file a response. After receipt of these documents, the Court will advise the parties whether a further hearing will be held. Court Reporter: ZOOM Webinar. (es)
July 15, 2021 Filing 87 DECLARATION of Jim Partridge re Smith Emery's Compliance with Document Production Obligations filed by Defendant Smith-Emery Company. (Turner, Jonathan)
July 14, 2021 Filing 85 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: The Discovery Conference previously scheduled for 7/15/21 at 11:00am #83 has been rescheduled for 7/16/21 at 11:00am before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. The Zoom Webinar information for Judge MacKinnon remains the same.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ib) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER APPROVING FOURTH STIPULATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER, #84 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Parties Fourth Stipulation to Modify the Scheduling Order is approved. The Scheduling Order is modified as follows: Motions due by 1December 17, 2021., Last date to conduct settlement conference is 11/8/2021., Final Pretrial Conference set for February 14, 2022 at 11:00 a.m., Jury Trial set for March 8, 2022 at 9:30 a.m., Status Conference set for November 15, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. See order for details. (shb)
July 8, 2021 Filing 84 Fourth Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, Marija)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTES (In Chambers): Order Setting Discovery Conference by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: The Court sets a discovery conference via Zoom for Thursday, July 15, 2021, at 11 a.m., to discuss defendant's compliance with its discovery obligations. The Clerk will contact the parties prior to the hearing regarding instructions to log on to Zoom for this conference. (es)
July 7, 2021 Filing 82 DECLARATION of Marija Kristich Decker Regarding Smith-Emery Company's Lack of Compliance with Court's Discovery Order filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Decker, Marija)
June 23, 2021 Filing 81 DECLARATION of Marija Kristich Decker re Declaration #79 in Response to Declaration of Jonathan M. Turner Re Complying with Court's February 10, 2021 Order filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Decker, Marija)
June 22, 2021 Filing 80 DECLARATION of Stephen C. Franz re Declaration #79 , Status Report,, #78 regarding Smith-Emery Company's Further Efforts to Comply With This Court's February 10, 2021 Order filed by Defendant Smith-Emery Company. (Franz, Stephen)
June 21, 2021 Filing 79 DECLARATION of Jonathan M. Turner re Status Report,, #78 re: Smith Emery Company's Efforts to Comply with this Court's February 10, 2021 Order filed by Defendant Smith-Emery Company. (Turner, Jonathan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 78 STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Decker, Marija)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTES (In Chambers): Order re Further Status Report by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: A further joint status report shall be filed on June 21, 2021. [See document for details.] (es)
May 21, 2021 Filing 76 STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Decker, Marija)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTES (In Chambers): Order re Further Status Report by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Having reviewed the parties' joint status report (ECF No. 73), the Court orders the parties to file a further joint status report no later than May 21, 2021. The Court expects that document production by defendant will be substantially complete by that time. (es)
April 12, 2021 Filing 73 STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Decker, Marija)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER APPROVING THIRD STIPULATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER, #71 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Parties Third Stipulation to Modify the Scheduling Order is approved. The Scheduling Order is modified as follows: Discovery cut-off August 2, 2021., Motions due by September 17, 2021., Last date to conduct settlement conference is August 9, 2021., Final Pretrial Conference set for November 15, 2021 at 11:00 A.M., Jury Trial continued to December 7, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. Status Conference set for August 16, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. (shb)
April 6, 2021 Filing 71 Third Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, Marija)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: GRANTING #48 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Jonathan M Turner for James E Partridge. Attorney John Logan Hunter terminated (shb)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: GRANTING #48 Request of Smith-Emery Company to Substitute Attorney Jonathan M. Turner in place and instead of John Logan Hunter. Added attorney Jonathan M Turner for Smith-Emery Company,Jonathan M Turner for Smith-Emery Company. (shb)
March 12, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of [PROPOSED] ORDER re REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY John Logan Hunter as counsel of record #48 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Request for Approval of Withdrawal of Attorney, #2 Proposed Order Request for Approval of Withdrawal of Attorney)(Hunter, John)
February 10, 2021 Filing 67 MINUTES RE PLAINTIFF'S TRUSTEES' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND DOCUMENTS (ECF #56) Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: As discussed on the record, plaintiff's motion to compel is granted - with the exception of Requests for Production (RFPs) 19, 20, 21, 22, and 23. Regarding those five RFPs, counsel for both sides shall meet and confer no later than February 24, 2021 as to the appropriate scope of responsive documents. All non-privileged, responsive documents for all RFPs raised in the motion to compel shall be produced by defendant no later than March 27, 2021. A joint status report regarding defendant's document production shall be filed no later than April 11, 2021. After review of the joint report, the Court will rule on plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees in connection with the motion to compel. Court Reporter: ZOOM Webinar. (es)
February 4, 2021 Filing 66 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: A Zoom hearing re Plaintiff Trustees' MOTION to Compel Defendant Smith-Emery Company to Provide Further Responses and Documents in Response to Plaintiffs' Trustees' Request for Production of Documents #56 is scheduled for 2/10/2021 at 2:00PM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Webinar information can be found on Judge MacKinnon's Schedules and Procedures page on the Court's website.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ib) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 28, 2021 Filing 65 STATEMENT of Response to Order to Show Cause MOTION to Compel Defendant Smith-Emery Company to Provide Further Responses and Documents in Response to Plaintiffs' Trustees' Request for Production of Documents #56 filed by Defendant Smith-Emery Company. (Franz, Stephen)
January 26, 2021 Filing 64 REPLY in support of MOTION to Compel Defendant Smith-Emery Company to Provide Further Responses and Documents in Response to Plaintiffs' Trustees' Request for Production of Documents #56 filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Decker, Marija)
January 19, 2021 Filing 63 OPPOSITION in Opposition re: MOTION to Compel Defendant Smith-Emery Company to Provide Further Responses and Documents in Response to Plaintiffs' Trustees' Request for Production of Documents #56 filed by Counter Claimants James E Partridge, Smith-Emery Company, Defendant Smith-Emery Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen Franz ISO Oppos to Motion to Compel Further Responses, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Attorney Stephen Charles Franz added to party James E Partridge(pty:cc))(Franz, Stephen)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Minutes (In Chambers): Order to Show Cause by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: On or before January 28, 2021, Defendant Smith-Emery Company shall show cause in writing why the Court should not grant Plaintiffs' motion to compel (ECF No. 56) and award expenses to Plaintiffs in the amount of $20,358 based on Defendant's violation of Local Rule 37-2.2 due to its failure to provide its portion of the joint stipulation to Plaintiffs' counsel despite several extensions and its failure to cooperate in presentation of this motion to the Court as required by the Local Rules. See Local Rule 37-4. (es)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTES (In Chambers): Order Vacating the February 9, 2021 Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order to Compel Defendant Smith-Emery Company to Provide Further Responses and Documents (ECF No. 56) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: The hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion noticed for February 9, 2021, a t 10 a.m., is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. No appearance is necessary. Local Rule 7-15. The motion shall stand submitted on the basis of the papers timely filed. The timing of the filing of any responsive briefs shall be based on the hearing date as originally noticed. (es)
January 6, 2021 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Michael Babel in support of MOTION to Compel Defendant Smith-Emery Company to Provide Further Responses and Documents in Response to Plaintiffs' Trustees' Request for Production of Documents #56 filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Decker, Marija)
January 6, 2021 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Bernardo Ramos in support of MOTION to Compel Defendant Smith-Emery Company to Provide Further Responses and Documents in Response to Plaintiffs' Trustees' Request for Production of Documents #56 filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A thru G)(Decker, Marija)
January 6, 2021 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Marija Kristich Decker in support of MOTION to Compel Defendant Smith-Emery Company to Provide Further Responses and Documents in Response to Plaintiffs' Trustees' Request for Production of Documents #56 filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A thru Z)(Decker, Marija)
January 6, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE OF MOTION re MOTION to Compel Defendant Smith-Emery Company to Provide Further Responses and Documents in Response to Plaintiffs' Trustees' Request for Production of Documents #56 filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. Motion set for hearing on 2/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Decker, Marija)
January 6, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant Smith-Emery Company to Provide Further Responses and Documents in Response to Plaintiffs' Trustees' Request for Production of Documents filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. Motion set for hearing on 2/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, Marija)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER APPROVING SECOND STIPULATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder, re Second Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order #53 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Parties' Second Stipulation to Modify the Scheduling Order is approved. The Scheduling Order is modified as follows: Settlement Completion Cut-Off: May 10, 2021; Status Conference re: Settlement: May 24, 2021 at 11:00 a.m.; Discovery Cut-Off: May 3, 2021; Motion Cut-Off: June 11, 2021; Pretrial Conference/Hearing on Motions in Limine: August 16, 2021 at 11:00 a.m.; Jury Trial: September 14, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. (bm)
December 11, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document,, #53 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events Court Events Orders (Non-Motion) - Select - Stipulation and Order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
December 10, 2020 Filing 53 Second Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, Marija)
August 17, 2020 Filing 52 Notice of Electronic Filing re Miscellaneous Document #50 , Order #51 e-mailed to Danton W. Liang bounced due to e-mail address not found. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER APPROVING IN PART THE FIRST STIPULATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER #50 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The deadlines and hearings originally scheduled have been rescheduled: Discovery cut-off 2/1/2021;Motions due by 3/12/2021;Last date to conduct settlement conference is 2/8/2021; Status Conference re settlement set for 2/22/2021 11:00 AM; Final Pretrial Conference/Motions in limine set for 5/17/2021 11:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 6/15/2021 09:30 AM. (lc)
August 14, 2020 Filing 50 First Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, Marija)
June 2, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY John Logan Hunter as counsel of record #48 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Missing corresponding G-01 order form (obtain at Court's Website); After which...As an alternative, prepare and e-file a formal Notice of Lodging, to be docketed only under its specific event: Notice of Lodging, to which the formal proposed order (G-01) is submitted as Separate Attachment thereto. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
June 2, 2020 Filing 48 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY John Logan Hunter as counsel of record filed by Defendants James E Partridge, Smith-Emery Company. (Hunter, John)
October 28, 2019 Filing 47 MINUTES OF STATE AGENCY COUNTERDEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM (ECF No. 36 filed September 20, 2019; TRUSTEES' MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM (ECF No. 37 filed September 20, 2019) granting #36 MOTION to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #37 MOTION Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: For the foregoing reasons, the Court: (1) DENIES the Trustees' motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure l2 (b)(1); (2) GRANTS the Trustees' motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b )( 6) without leave to amend; (3) DENIES the Trustees' motion to strike pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(f), without prejudice to raise the same objections at proceedings on summary judgment; and (4) GRANTS the State Agencies' motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(l) without leave to amend. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (bm)
October 11, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim #37 filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Decker, Marija)
October 11, 2019 Filing 45 REPLY in support of MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM filed by Counter Defendants California Building Standards Commission, State Of California, Division of The State Architect, State of California, Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development. (Boutin, Gabrielle)
October 7, 2019 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim #37 filed by Defendant Smith-Emery Company, Counter Claimant Smith-Emery Company. (Turner, Jonathan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim #36 filed by Defendant Smith-Emery Company, Counter Claimant Smith-Emery Company. (Turner, Jonathan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 42 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim #37 filed by Defendant Smith-Emery Company, Counter Claimant Smith-Emery Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Turner, Jonathan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim #37 filed by Defendant Smith-Emery Company, Counter Claimant Smith-Emery Company. (Turner, Jonathan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim #37 filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Decker, Marija)
September 20, 2019 Filing 39 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim #37 filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-H)(Decker, Marija)
September 20, 2019 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Marija Kristich Decker in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim #37 filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Decker, Marija)
September 20, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. Motion set for hearing on 10/28/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Decker, Marija)
September 20, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Counterdefendants California Building Standards Commission, State Of California, Division of The State Architect, State of California, Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development. Motion set for hearing on 10/28/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Request for Judicial Notice) (Boutin, Gabrielle)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 10/16/19. Status Conference set for 10/26/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (lc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Request for leave to file amended pleadings or to add parties: December 2, 2019;Settlement Completion Cutoff: October 16, 2019;Factual Discovery Cut-off: September 30, 2020;Last Day to File Motions: November 13, 2020;Status Conference re: Settlement (11:00 A.M.): October 26, 2020;Pretrial Conference/Hearing on Motions in Limine (11:00 A.M.): January 25, 2021;and Jury Trial (9:30 A.M.): February 9, 2021.Motions in limine shall be noticed for the same date and time of the PretrialC onference, and filed 28 days prior thereto. Motions in limine/oppositions shall not exceed 5 pages in length and no replies will be accepted. Counsel inform the court of the parties preference to go before a private mediator.for settlement purposes Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (lc)
September 5, 2019 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Jonathan M. Turner re Miscellaneous Document #32 , Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan,,,, #29 SMITH-EMERY COMPANY AND JAMES E. PARTRIDGES ADDENDUM TO THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE REPORT PURSUANT TO RULE 26(f) filed by Counter Claimants James E Partridge, Smith-Emery Company, Defendant Smith-Emery Company. (Turner, Jonathan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 32 SMITH-EMERY COMPANY AND JAMES E. PARTRIDGES ADDENDUM re: Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan,,,, #29 (Turner, Jonathan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
September 3, 2019 Filing 30 SCHEDULING NOTICE ADVANCED by Judge Christina A. Snyder re: Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #29 and Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference #15 , previously scheduled for 9/10/2019 at 10:00 AM has been rescheduled. Scheduling Conference is advanced from 9/10/2019 to 9/9/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 3, 2019 Filing 29 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Counter Defendants Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust.. (Decker, Marija)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:09-cv-01476 CAS(VBKx). Case transferred from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm to Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-04058 CAS(AFMx). Signed by Judge Christina A. Snyder (rn)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR COUNTERDEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIM, #26 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties Stipulation to Extend Time for Counterdefendants to respond to the Counterclaim is approved. Counterdefendants shall have an extension of time, up to and including September 20, 2019, within which to file a response to Defendant and Counterclaimants Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief. (shb)
August 23, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, Counterclaim,,, #11 filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants James E Partridge, Smith-Emery Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation to Extend Time For Counterdefendants to Respond to Counterclaim)(Turner, Jonathan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File,, #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): The case number is missing the judge inititla. The complete case number is 2:19-cv-04058-RSWL (FFMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaim, #23 re Counter Defendants State Of California, Division of The State Architect answer due 9/6/2019 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties Stipulation to Extend Time for State Agency Counter defendants to respond to Counterclaim is approved. Counter defendants Division of State Architect, Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development, and California Building Commission shall have an extension of time, up to and including September 6, 2019, within which to file a response to the Counterclaim. (shb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Counterclaim filed by Counterdefendants California Building Standards Commission, State Of California, Division of The State Architect, State of California, Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Gabrielle D Boutin added to party California Building Standards Commission(pty:cd), Attorney Gabrielle D Boutin added to party State Of California, Division of The State Architect(pty:cd), Attorney Gabrielle D Boutin added to party State of California, Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development(pty:cd))(Boutin, Gabrielle)
August 8, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen Charles Franz counsel for Defendant Smith-Emery Company, Counter Claimant Smith-Emery Company. Adding Stephen C. Franz as counsel of record for Smith-Emery Company (Defendant and counterclaimants) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant and Counterclaimants Smith-Emery Company. (Attorney Stephen Charles Franz added to party Smith-Emery Company(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Charles Franz added to party Smith-Emery Company(pty:cc))(Franz, Stephen)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaim, #20 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. IT IS ORDERED that the parties Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiffs and Counter-defendants to respond to the Counterclaim is approved. Plaintiffs and Counter-defendants shall have an extension of time to and including September 6, 2019 within which to file a response to Defendant and Counter-claimants Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief. (shb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Respond to Counterclaim filed by Plaintiffs and Counterdefendants Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, Marija)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant James E Partridge, Smith-Emery Company, re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, Counterclaim,,, #11 , Summons Issued,,, #14 Re IUOE Local 12 served on 07/24/19. (Turner, Jonathan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant James E Partridge, Smith-Emery Company, re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, Counterclaim,,, #11 , Summons Issued,,, #14 re CA Office of Statewide Health Planning and Dev. served on 07/25/19. (Turner, Jonathan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant James E Partridge, Smith-Emery Company, re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, Counterclaim,,, #11 , Summons Issued,,, #14 Re CA Div of State Architect served on 07/24/19. (Turner, Jonathan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant James E Partridge, Smith-Emery Company, re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, Counterclaim,,, #11 , Summons Issued,,, #14 served on 07/24/19. (Turner, Jonathan)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SETTING SCHEDULING by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 10:00 AM. See order for complete details. (jre)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), COUNTERCLAIM, #11 as to Crossclaim Defendants California Building Standards Commission, Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, International Union of Operating Engineers Local Union No. 12, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, State Of California, Division of The State Architect, State of California, Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (shb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant Smith-Emery Company, identifying JAMES E. PARTRIDGE, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL UNION NO. 12, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, DIVISION OF STATE ARCHITECT, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, OFFICE OF STATEWIDE HEALTH PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT, CALIFORNIA BUILDING STANDARDS COMMISSION. (Turner, Jonathan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, Counterclaim,,, #11 filed by Counterclaimant Smith-Emery Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 to Summons, #2 Attachment 2 to Summons)(Turner, Jonathan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, International Union of Operating Engineers Local Union No. 12, State Of California, Division of The State Architect, State of California, Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development, California Building Standards Commission filed by Defendant Smith-Emery Company.(Turner, Jonathan)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Smith-Emery Company answer now due 7/15/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by defendant Smith-Emery Company.(Turner, Jonathan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Smith-Emery Company.. (Turner, Jonathan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Contract Administration Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, upon Defendant Smith-Emery Company served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tammy Irons - Receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Decker, Marija)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Smith-Emery Company. (esa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, (Decker, Marija)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Decker, Marija)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Contract Administration Fund, Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. (Decker, Marija)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23709596 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Contract Administration Fund, Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust, Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust, Fund for Construction Industry Advancement. (Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Contract Administration Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Fund for Construction Industry Advancement(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Marija Kristich Decker added to party Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust(pty:pla))(Decker, Marija)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust et al v. Smith-Emery Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Fund for Construction Industry Advancement
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Training Trust
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Local 12 Defined Contribution Plan
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Engineers Contract Compliance Committee Fund
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: California Building Standards Commission
Represented By: Gabrielle D Boutin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: State of California, Office of Statewide Health Planning and Development
Represented By: Gabrielle D Boutin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: State Of California, Division of The State Architect
Represented By: Gabrielle D Boutin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: International Union of Operating Engineers Local Union No. 12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Smith-Emery Company
Represented By: Danton W Liang
Represented By: Jonathan M Turner
Represented By: Stephen Charles Franz
Represented By: John Logan Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: James E Partridge
Represented By: Jonathan M Turner
Represented By: John Logan Hunter
Represented By: Stephen Charles Franz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contract Administration Fund
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern California Partnership for Jobs Fund
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Workers' Compensation Trust
Represented By: Marija Kristich Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?