Alonzo McKinney v. G. Newson
Petitioner: Alonso McKiney
Respondent: G. Newson
Case Number: 2:2019cv04059
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Related to: Order Dismissing Petition #10 . IT IS ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS ORDERED that: the FAP is DISMISSED; and Judgment shall be entered dismissing this action without prejudice. The Court concludes that a certificate of appealability is unwarranted, and thus, a certificate of appealability is DENIED. (see document for further details) (hr)
June 12, 2019 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 , REQUEST for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #8 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval. (gr)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner Alonso McKiney. (rn)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; Declaration in Support filed by Petitioner Alonso McKiney. (hr)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against Respondent G. Newson amending Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #1 , filed by Petitioner Alonso McKiney(hr)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER - In Chambers - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Petitioner is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE no later than June 12, 2019, why the Petition should not be dismissed for violating Habeas Rule 2 and for constituting an unauthorized second or successive petition. To discharge this Order and proceed with this action, Petitioner shall file, no later than the June 12, 2019 deadline, a First Amended Petition that does all of the following: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (Attachments: #1 blank Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody, #2 blank Notice of Dismissal) (ch)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111, #2 CV-38) (lh)
May 9, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Alonso McKiney. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/10/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/8/2019 ORDERING CASE TRANSFERRED to the Western Division of the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/10/2019.]
May 6, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Alonso McKiney. (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/10/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due by 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/10/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against G. Newson by Alonso McKiney. (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alonzo McKinney v. G. Newson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alonso McKiney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: G. Newson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?