Sonia Lopez v. Nancy Berryhill
Plaintiff: Sonia Lopez
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv04082
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sonia Lopez, upon Defendant Nancy Berryhill served on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pena, Jonathan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-4082 KES on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy Berryhill. (Attorney Francesco P Benavides added to party Nancy Berryhill(pty:dft))(Benavides, Francesco)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sonia Lopez, upon Defendant Nancy Berryhill served on 5/17/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pena, Jonathan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by PLAINTIFF Sonia Lopez. (Pena, Jonathan)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy Berryhill. (jdo)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: granting #4 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (jdo)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Sonia Lopez. (Pena, Jonathan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support Sonia Lopez. (Pena, Jonathan) Modified on 5/10/2019 (et).
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties (Pena, Jonathan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sonia Lopez. (Pena, Jonathan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request. (Attorney Jonathan Omar Pena added to party Sonia Lopez(pty:pla))(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonia Lopez v. Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Francesco P Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Lopez
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?