Alexander Bayonne Stross v. CALCAP Lending, LLC
Plaintiff: Alexander Bayonne Stross
Defendant: CALCAP Lending, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04120
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the following docket entry has been corrected as indicated below. Re: Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation Early Mediation and Stay Program #17 . Other: Document incorrectly docketed into this action by error. Document should be disregarded. (bm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 **DISREGARD** Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation Early Mediation and Stay Program. See Notice for complete details. (jre) Modified on 7/9/2019 (jre).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDUING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2020 at 02:00 PM. (jre)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CALCAP Lending, LLC, (Sandoval, Laura)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant CALCAP Lending, LLC.(Sandoval, Laura)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to CALCAP Lending, LLC answer now due 7/5/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant CALCAP Lending, LLC.(Sandoval, Laura)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to CALCAP Lending, LLC answer now due 6/21/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant CALCAP Lending, LLC.(Attorney Laura Lisa Sandoval added to party CALCAP Lending, LLC(pty:dft))(Sandoval, Laura)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alexander Bayonne Stross, upon Defendant CALCAP Lending, LLC served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Thao Lee, Assitant to Registered Agent Edward Roohan, and authorized to accept service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant CALCAP Lending, LLC. (et)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Alexander Bayonne Stross. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Alexander Bayonne Stross. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alexander Bayonne Stross, (Grossbardt, Jonah)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Alexander Bayonne Stross (Grossbardt, Jonah)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alexander Bayonne Stross. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23721712 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Alexander Bayonne Stross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Registration, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement) (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Alexander Bayonne Stross(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander Bayonne Stross v. CALCAP Lending, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALCAP Lending, LLC
Represented By: Laura Lisa Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Bayonne Stross
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?