Omar Ramirez v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Omar Ramirez
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv04147
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-4147 AFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Annabelle J Yang added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Yang, Annabelle)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Rosales, Steven)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Omar Ramirez, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/29/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rosales, Steven)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Mandatory chambers copies of e-filed documents shall be delivered to the Magistrate Judge's box located outside the Clerk's Office, 12th Floor, Roybal Federal Building and Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012, within twenty-four hours after e-filing. See Order for details. (dml)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Plaintiff will promptly serve the summons and complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. See Order for complete details. (dml)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (dml)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dml)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Omar Ramirez, (Rosales, Steven)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Omar Ramirez. (Rosales, Steven)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Omar Ramirez. (Rosales, Steven)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Omar Ramirez. (Rosales, Steven)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Omar Ramirez. (Attorney Steven G Rosales added to party Omar Ramirez(pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omar Ramirez v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Ramirez
Represented By: Steven G Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Annabelle J Yang
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?