XPO GF America, Inc. v. Qiuheng Liao et al
Plaintiff: XPO GF America, Inc.
Defendant: Denise Clavesilla, Jialin Liao, Qiuheng Liao, Christophe Bigot and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04173
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Maria A Audero
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR RESPONSE THERETO by Judge Percy Anderson, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to Amend #28 : Having reviewed the stipulation of the parties regarding Plaintiff XPO GF America, Inc.'s ("XPO") filing of a First Amended Complaint, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1) XPO shall file a First Amended Complaint no later than July 15, 2019; and 2) Defendants Qiuheng Liao, Jialin Liao, and Denise Clavesilla shall have twenty days after XPO's First Amended Complaint is filed to answer or otherwise respond to XPO's First Amended Complaint. To the extent that Qiuheng, Jialin, or Clavesilla bring a Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 12(b) motion and/or motion to dismiss or stay under the Colorado River doctrine within these time parameters, these motions will be considered timely. (bm)
July 2, 2019 Filing 28 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff XPO GF America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Meyer, Krystle)
June 5, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 4, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gerald Philip Peters counsel for Defendants Jialin Liao, Qiuheng Liao. Adding Gerald P. Peters as counsel of record for Qiuheng Liao & Jialin Liao for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Qiuheng Liao & Jialin Liao. (Peters, Gerald)
June 4, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Jialin Liao, Qiuheng Liao, identifying Qiuheng & Jialin Liao. (Attorney Gerald Philip Peters added to party Jialin Liao(pty:dft), Attorney Gerald Philip Peters added to party Qiuheng Liao(pty:dft))(Peters, Gerald)
June 3, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Denise Clavesilla answer now due 7/10/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff XPO GF America, Inc..(Meyer, Krystle)
June 3, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Clyde F DeWitt on behalf of Defendant Denise Clavesilla (DeWitt, Clyde)
June 3, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Denise Clavesilla, identifying XPO GF American, Inc., ROSEN SABA LLP, Qiuheng Liao, Jialin Liao, Denise Clavesilla, Christophe Bigot. (Attorney Clyde F DeWitt added to party Denise Clavesilla(pty:dft))(DeWitt, Clyde)
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jialin Liao answer now due 7/15/2019; Qiuheng Liao answer now due 7/8/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff XPO GF America, Inc..(Meyer, Krystle)
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff XPO GF America, Inc., upon Defendant Jialin Liao served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Jialin Liao in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meyer, Krystle)
May 28, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff XPO GF America, Inc., upon Defendant Denise Clavesilla served on 5/18/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Denise Clavesilla in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Meyer, Krystle)
May 17, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff XPO GF America, Inc., upon Defendant Qiuheng Liao served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Quiheng Liao in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Saba, Ryan)
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Christophe Bigot. (ghap)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Denise Clavesilla. (ghap)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jialin Liao. (ghap)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Qiuheng Liao. (ghap)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Plaintiff XPO GF America, Inc.. (Meyer, Krystle)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Krystle Dawn Meyer on behalf of Plaintiff XPO GF America, Inc. (Attorney Krystle Dawn Meyer added to party XPO GF America, Inc.(pty:pla))(Meyer, Krystle)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff XPO GF America, Inc., (Saba, Ryan)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff XPO GF America, Inc.. (Saba, Ryan)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff XPO GF America, Inc.. (Saba, Ryan)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff XPO GF America, Inc.. (Saba, Ryan)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff XPO GF America, Inc.. (Saba, Ryan)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff XPO GF America, Inc.. (Saba, Ryan)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23736030 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff XPO GF America, Inc.. (Attorney Ryan D Saba added to party XPO GF America, Inc.(pty:pla))(Saba, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XPO GF America, Inc. v. Qiuheng Liao et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Clavesilla
Represented By: Clyde F DeWitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jialin Liao
Represented By: Gerald Philip Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qiuheng Liao
Represented By: Gerald Philip Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christophe Bigot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XPO GF America, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan D Saba
Represented By: Krystle Dawn Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?