Bronson Holding Company, LLC v. Geraldine Moyer et al

Plaintiff: Bronson Holding Company, LLC
Defendant: United States of America on Behalf of Internal Revenue Service, Geraldine Moyer, Russell Reiff, Tena Moyer, The California Franchise Tax Board, Does 1 through 10 and United States of America
Cross Defendant: Roes
Case Number: 2:2019cv04175
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Manuel L Real
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Crossclaim, #5 Answer of Cross-Defendant Bronson Holding Company, LLC To Cross-Complaint of Geraldine Moyer, as Trustee of The Geraldine Moyer Trust; Tena Moyer, as Trustee of the Tena M. Moyer Trust; Russell filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant Bronson Holding Company, LLC.(Attorney Jeremy H Rothstein added to party Bronson Holding Company, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jeremy H Rothstein added to party Bronson Holding Company, LLC(pty:crd))(Rothstein, Jeremy)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing the Official Record of a State-Court Proceeding filed by Defendant United States of America. (Corrected filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3)(Greene, Gavin)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing the Official Record of a State-Court Proceeding filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3)(Greene, Gavin)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendants Geraldine Moyer, Tena Moyer, Russell Reiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Answer to First Amended Complaint)(Murphy, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 CROSSCLAIM against Cross-Defendant Bronson Holding Company, LLC; Jury Demand, filed by Cross-Complainants Russell Reiff, Geraldine Moyer, Tena Moyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Cross-Complaint) (Attorney Michael Donnelly Murphy added to party Geraldine Moyer(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Donnelly Murphy added to party Tena Moyer(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Donnelly Murphy added to party Russell Reiff(pty:dft))(Murphy, Michael)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, (Answer and Claim of the United States) filed by Defendant United States of America.(Greene, Gavin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
May 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, Geraldine Moyer, Tena Moyer, Russell Reiff, The California Franchise Tax Board, The Internal Revenue Service amending Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by plaintiff Bronson Holding Company, LLC. Filed in State Court on 4/4/2019 Submitted with attachment 1 Exhibit 1 to notice of removal #1 (car)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant United States of America on Behalf of Internal Revenue Service. (Greene, Gavin)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles East District - Pomona, case number KC070292 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendant United States of America on Behalf of Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Gavin L Greene added to party United States of America on Behalf of Internal Revenue Service(pty:dft))(Greene, Gavin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bronson Holding Company, LLC v. Geraldine Moyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America on Behalf of Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Gavin L Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geraldine Moyer
Represented By: Michael Donnelly Murphy
Represented By: Geoffrey M Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Reiff
Represented By: Michael Donnelly Murphy
Represented By: Geoffrey M Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tena Moyer
Represented By: Michael Donnelly Murphy
Represented By: Geoffrey M Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The California Franchise Tax Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Gavin L Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bronson Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy H Rothstein
Represented By: James Richard Felton
Represented By: Roseann Catherine Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Roes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?