Arturo Osiel Valencia Barrera v. Huntington Memorial Hospital
Plaintiff: Arturo Osiel Valencia Barrera
Defendant: Huntington Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 2:2019cv04179
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee. In the present case, it appears that one or more of these time periods has not been met. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before July 25, 2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this Order To Show Cause, on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: An answer by the following defendant(s): Plaintiff's application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed if the above-mentioned document(s) are not filed by the date indicated above. (lom)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arturo Osiel Valencia Barrera, upon Defendant Huntington Memorial Hospital served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed by personal service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; the name of the recipient is not indicated. Original Summons NOT returned. (gk)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Granting #4 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (gk)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Huntington Memorial Hospital. (hr)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (et)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Arturo Osiel Valencia Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (et)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Arturo Osiel Valencia Barrera. (et)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Arturo Osiel Valencia Barrera. (et)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Huntington Memorial Hospital. Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal., filed by Plaintiff Arturo Osiel Valencia Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Huntington Memorial Hospital) (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arturo Osiel Valencia Barrera v. Huntington Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Osiel Valencia Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?