Maurice D. Kiely v. U2
Plaintiff: Maurice D Kiely
Defendant: U2
Case Number: 2:2019cv04182
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 19-55636 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #10 as to Plaintiff Maurice D Kiely. (shb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Maurice D Kiely. Appeal of Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #6 Filed On: 5/20/19; Entered On: 5/20/19; In forma pauperis is pending. (mat)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Maurice D Kiely. (mat)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned addressed to Maurice Kiely re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 (jm)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Change of address Filed by Plaintiff Maurice D Kiely. (lom)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED INFORMA PAUPERIS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: REQUEST IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In forma Pauperis is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby DISMISSED Immediately. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (shb)
May 16, 2019 Re APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(jm)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by plaintiff Maurice D Kiely. (esa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Maurice D Kiely. (esa)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant U2. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F Mumm, filed by plaintiff Maurice D Kiely. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maurice D. Kiely v. U2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice D Kiely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?