Michael Brang v. Three B Financial, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Michael Brang
Defendant: Three B Financial, LLC and Does 1 through 10 Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04186
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Three B Financial, LLC answer now due 8/7/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Three B Financial, LLC.(Attorney Dhruv M Sharma added to party Three B Financial, LLC(pty:dft))(Sharma, Dhruv)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Three B Financial, LLC. (car)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Brang, (Friedman, Todd)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Brang. (Friedman, Todd)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Brang. (Friedman, Todd)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23738928 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Michael Brang. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Michael Brang(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Brang v. Three B Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brang
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Adrian Robert Bacon
Represented By: Meghan Elisabeth George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three B Financial, LLC
Represented By: Dhruv M Sharma
Represented By: Jeffrey Ray Seewald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?