Raymond Thomas v. Felipe Martinez
Petitioner: Raymond Thomas
Respondent: Warden Felipe Martinez
Case Number: 2:2019cv04207
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr., Related to: Order Dismissing Successive Habeas Petition, #5 . IT IS ADJUDGED that the Petition and this action are hereby dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING SUCCESSIVE HABEAS PETITION by Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. The petition under 28 U.S.C. 2241 is ordered dismissed as impermissibly successive. Petitioner's request for appointment of counsel is denied as moot. (see document for further details) (hr) Modified on 6/20/2019 (hr).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order PRESENTED BY Order and Judgment issued by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #1 . Proposed Order forwarded to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr. for review. (cw)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $5.00 filing fee from Raymond Thomas. Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #3 . Receipt number LA189643. (ek)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: FILING OF PETITION WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. On or before June 13, 2019 Petitioner is to pay the filing fee or submit a Declaration in Support of Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (Form CV-27). (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Form CV-27) (hr)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV 111) (esa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities - PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim, (Filing fee due), filed by petitioner Raymond Thomas. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raymond Thomas v. Felipe Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raymond Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Felipe Martinez
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?