Peter Franklin Klein v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al

Petitioner: Peter Franklin Klein
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons and Felipe Martinez, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04224
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Sealed Document, #13 (Jacobs, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit E to Declaration of Bryan Erickson in support of Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 8-6) re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #12 filed by Respondents Federal Bureau of Prisons, Felipe Martinez, Jr.(Jacobs, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: granting #10 Ex Parte Application to Seal Document. (ec)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document (Exhibit E to Declaration of Bryan Erickson (Dkt. 8-8))) under seal #10 filed by Respondents Federal Bureau of Prisons, Felipe Martinez, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(Jacobs, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document (Exhibit E to Declaration of Bryan Erickson (Dkt. 8-8))) under seal filed by Respondents Federal Bureau of Prisons, Felipe Martinez, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Document, #4 Certificate of Service)(Jacobs, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish directing action re Opposition to Motion #8 . By no later than August 2, 2019, Petitioner shall take one of two actions. If Petitioner concedes that dismissal of the Petition is warranted, he shall file and serve a Notice of Dismissal. With this Order, the Clerk shall send to Petitioner a CV-09 Notice of Dismissal form. If, instead, Petitioner disputes that dismissal is required, he shall file and serve a Response to the Motion, explaining how the action has not been mooted and why dismissal is not warranted due to his failure to exhaust his administrative remedies. If Petitioner files and serves such a Response, Respondent may file a Reply within 14 days. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Dismissal) (ec)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Dkt. 1) and Motion to Dismiss Petition filed by Respondents Federal Bureau of Prisons, Felipe Martinez, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Declaration)(Attorney Matthew J Jacobs added to party Felipe Martinez, Jr(pty:res))(Jacobs, Matthew)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, ORDERING Letter submitted by Petitioner Peter Franklin Klein received on 6/3/19 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: The questions posed and requests made in the letter are not properly addressed to the Court or its staff. In addition, the Court and its staff cannot provide petitioner with legal advice. (ec)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner Peter Franklin Klein. (rn)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Assistant United States Attorney MATTHEW JACOBS on behalf of RESPONDENT Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Attorney Matthew J Jacobs added to party Federal Bureau of Prisons(pty:res))(Jacobs, Matthew)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $5.00 filing fee from Peter Klein. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #1 . Receipt number LA189297. (ek)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish directing that Respondent Felipe Martinez, Jr file Answer to the Petition not later than 7/5/2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Blank Consent form) (ec)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111 and CV-69) (ghap)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J Standish.(Filing fee $ 5: FEE DUE), filed by petitioner Peter Franklin Klein. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peter Franklin Klein v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter Franklin Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Matthew J Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Felipe Martinez, Jr.
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Matthew J Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?