Derrick Munzel Wright Jr v. Omar Covarrubias et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Munzel Wright, Jr
Defendant: Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, Omar Covarrubias and Cesar Del Castillo
Case Number: 2:2019cv04227
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: granting #10 Request for Extension of Time. Petitioner;s deadline to file the required Notice of Compliance is extended to August 4, 2019. (ec)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST for Extension of Time filed by Plaintiff Derrick Munzel Wright, Jr. (ec)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance Re Service of Process filed by Plaintiff Derrick Munzel Wright, Jr. (ec)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, ORDERING Letter submitted by Plaintiff Derrick Munzel Wright, Jr received on 6/6/19 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: See the Court's Orders of June 5, 2019 [Dockets 5-6], which address and resolve the issues raised in plaintiff's letter. (ec)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 as to Defendants. (ec)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS BY THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. Upon receipt of this order, the United States Marshal may request that the defendant(s) waive service. If a waiver of service is not returned by a defendant within thirty (30) days of the date of mailing a request for waiver, the United States Marshal shall personally serve process upon that defendant. (ec)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE SERVICE OF PROCESS by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. Within thirty days of this order, Plaintiff shall file with the Court a "Notice of Compliance re: Service of Process" with attached copies of the USM-285 that have been submitted to the United States Marshals Service. (ec)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: granting #2 Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee.. It is further ORDERED that the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the initial filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $6.00 must be paid within 30 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with this order. (ec)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Derrick Munzel Wright, Jr. (esa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants Omar Covarrubias(Deputy Sheriff, in official capacity), Omar Covarrubias(Deputy Sheriff, in individual capacity), Cesar Del Castillo(Deputy Sheriff, in individual capacity), Cesar Del Castillo(Deputy Sheriff, in official capacity), Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department pursuant to 42 USC 1983pr. Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, filed by plaintiff Derrick Munzel Wright, Jr. (Attachments: #1 part 2) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derrick Munzel Wright Jr v. Omar Covarrubias et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Covarrubias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar Del Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Munzel Wright, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?