Christopher Adin Graham v. United States of America et al
Petitioner: Christopher Adin Graham
Respondent: Warden Swain and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv04232
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 Request for a Copy of Government's Motion to Dismiss filed by Petitioner Christopher A. Graham. (sp)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. The Court is in receipt of a document filed by Petitioner on 6/20/19, requesting a copy of "Respondents' Motion to Dismiss, etc.," filed 6/13/19. The Clerk forthwith shall mail to Petitioner a copy of all documents filed in connection with "Respondents' Motion to Dismiss, etc." (Attachments: #1 Motion to dismiss, #2 Declaration re Motion to Dismiss) (sp)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: re: MOTION to Dismiss #6 . The Court is in receipt of "Respondents' Motion to Dismiss, etc.", filed 6/13/19. Petitioner shall file opposition to the motion within 30 days of the date of this order. At that time, the Court will take the motion under submission without oral argument, unless the Court otherwise orders. Failure to file timely opposition to the motion may result in the denial and dismissal of the Petition. Respondent need not file an Answer to the Petition until further order of this Court. (sp)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Respondents Swain, United States of America, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 #6 , Notice of Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the USA, #5 , Declaration (Motion related), #7 served on June 13, 2019. (Faerstein, Brian)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Brian R. Faerstein in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 #6 filed by Respondents Swain, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Faerstein, Brian)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Respondents Swain, United States of America. (Faerstein, Brian)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Assistant United States Attorney Brian R. Faerstein on behalf of Respondents Swain, United States of America. (Attorney Brian R Faerstein added to party Swain(pty:res), Attorney Brian R Faerstein added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Faerstein, Brian)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. It is Ordered that Petitioner shall serve upon Respondent or, if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon its attorneys, a copy of every future pleading or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. (sp)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. It is Hereby Ordered that Respondent file an Answer to the Petition within 23 days of the date of this Order. It is Further Ordered that, if Petitioner desires to file a Reply to the Answer, he shall do so within 15 days of the date that that the Answer is filed. It is Further Ordered that Respondent shall give timely notice of any court proceeding to any person who is a "crime victim" within the meaning of 18 U.S.C. section 3771. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Notice) (sp)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV 111) (esa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, (Filing fee due), filed by petitioner Christopher Adin Graham. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher Adin Graham v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Swain
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Brian R Faerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Brian R Faerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Adin Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?