Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16 v. Maersk Line A S et al

Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16
Defendant: Maersk Line, Limited, Maersk Line A/S, EZ Logistics LLC, Does One through Ten and Maersk Line A S
Case Number: 2:2019cv04244
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16. Dismissal is With prejudice. (Kirsch, Joshua)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 7/3/2019. (vdr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16, upon Defendant EZ Logistics LLC served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rizhun Chen - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16, upon Defendant Maersk Line A S served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro - CT - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16, upon Defendant Maersk Line, Limited served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro - CT - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant EZ Logistics LLC. (ghap)
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Maersk Line, Limited. (ghap)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Maersk Line A S. (ghap)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16 (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16, identifying Best Food Services, LLC; TRN Transportation, Inc.; Express Shipping Logistics, Inc.. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16. (Kirsch, Joshua)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23749133 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16. (Attorney Joshua E Kirsch added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16(pty:pla))(Kirsch, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16 v. Maersk Line A S et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maersk Line, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maersk Line A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZ Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does One through Ten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maersk Line A S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. VE17XX3615D16
Represented By: Joshua E Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?