In Re: 18923 Vintage Street Northridge CA 91324
Petitioner: In re 18923 Vintage Street Northridge CA 91324 and Summit Management Company, LLC
Claimant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, and United States of America
In Re: 18923 Vintage Street Northridge CA 91324
Case Number: 2:2019cv04251
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. As discussed on the call, the Court will refrain from scheduling further settlement proceedings until it gains more visibility into the status of the action. Instead, the government is directed to notify Judge Wilners CRD by e-mail if the Kussins appear in the action. (See Minute Order for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 6/25/2019. (vm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Telephone Conference set for June 25, 2019 at 9:00 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES (DKT. 6) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has reviewed the parties June 6, 2019 Joint Report and sets the following deadlines: June 24, 2019: Deadline to schedule a date for mediation with Magistrate Judge Wilner. August 26, 2019: Last day to amend or add parties. January 27, 2020: Last day to participate in a settlement conference/mediation. January 31, 2020: Last day to file notice of settlement/ joint report re settlement. February 3, 2020 at 11:30 a.m.: Post Mediation. November 18, 2019: Initial Expert Disclosures. December 2, 2019: Rebuttal Expert Disclosures. December 16, 2019: Expert Discovery Cut-Off. December 16, 2019: Last day to file All Motions (including discovery motions). The parties will be invited to submit proposed dates for the final pretrial conference and trial, if necessary, upon the Courts final ruling on the motions. The trial estimate will be set at the final pretrial conference. The Court grants the parties request to participate in a settlement conference with Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. See order for details. (shb)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than January 27, 2020. Status Conference set for February 3, 2020 at 11:30 am before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ake)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Summit Management Company, LLC, served on June 6, 2019. (Gilligan, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1 day, filed by Claimant United States of America.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Briggs, Melissa)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Petition (case opening), filed by Claimant United States of America.(Briggs, Melissa)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing the Official Record of a State-Court Proceeding filed by Defendant United States of America. (Briggs, Melissa)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Hearing: No Hearing/Under Submission. Joint Report Due: June 7, 2019. This case has been assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt. This Order applies to all parties in this action, whether or not they are represented by counsel. Counsel, as used in this Order, also refers to parties who are representing themselves. If plaintiff has not already served the complaint (or any amendment thereto) on each defendant, plaintiff shall promptly do so and file proofs of service within three (3) days thereafter. Defendant(s) also shall timely serve and file their responsive pleadings and file proofs of service within three (3) days thereafter. See order for further details. (shb)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt (lc)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE'S SALE, filed by Petitioner Summit Management Company, LLC. Filed in State Court on 4/10/2019 Submitted with attachment 1 Exhibit 1 to notice of removal #1 (car) Modified on 5/17/2019 (car).
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Claimant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Briggs, Melissa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles Chatsworth Courthouse, case number 19CHCP00128 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Claimant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Melissa Briggs added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:clm))(Briggs, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: 18923 Vintage Street Northridge CA 91324
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In re 18923 Vintage Street Northridge CA 91324
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Summit Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Cori Brooke Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Represented By: Melissa Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: United States of America
Represented By: Melissa Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: 18923 Vintage Street Northridge CA 91324
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?