Lori Hillman v. Life Insurance Company of North America, et al
Plaintiff: Lori Hillman
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA,, Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company LLC Health and Welfare Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 2:2019cv04277
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 7/18/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Shea, Edith)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company LLC Health and Welfare Plan answer now due 7/19/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company LLC Health and Welfare Plan.(Tseng, Jenner)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 7/11/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Edith S Shea added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Shea, Edith)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lori Hillman, upon Defendant Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company LLC Health and Welfare Plan served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro - Agent for CT Corp. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Horrow, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lori Hillman, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro - Agent for CT Corp. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Horrow, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Courts Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. (shb)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John A. Kronstadt, United States District Judge. The case number will now read: LA CV19-04277 JAK (Ex). Because all pleadings are routed using the judge's initials, please be sure to use the initials JAK in place of the initials DDP on all future filings. Judge Kronstadt's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Andrea Keifer, can be reached at 213.894.2156. #9 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-04277 JAK(Ex). (rn)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company LLC Health and Welfare Plan. (esa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (esa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lori Hillman, identifying Life Insurance Company of North America; and Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company LLC Health and Welfare Plan. (Horrow, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lori Hillman. (Horrow, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lori Hillman. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Horrow, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23754640 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lori Hillman. (Attorney Michael B Horrow added to party Lori Hillman(pty:pla))(Horrow, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lori Hillman v. Life Insurance Company of North America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Hillman
Represented By: Michael B Horrow
Represented By: Scott E Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company LLC Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: Michael S Turner
Represented By: Jenner Chien-Nan Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Edith S Shea
Represented By: Daniel W Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?