Sharon Phillips v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Sharon Phillips
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2019cv04281
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for September 30, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/23/2019. (sw)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, identifying Sharon Phillips; Life Insurance Company of North America ("LINA"); Connecticut General Corporation; Cigna Holdings, Inc.; Cigna Holding Company; and Cigna Corporation. (Horn, Heather)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Nicole Y Blohm added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Blohm, Nicole)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Court's Standing Order filed by Plaintiff Sharon Phillips. (Bather, Phillip)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 7/10/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Heather E Horn added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Horn, Heather)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-04281 RGK(PLAx). (rn)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sharon Phillips, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro of CT Corporation System Registered Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bather, Phillip)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 CORRECTED NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error case number is missing judge's initials on the form Re: Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) form #6 . A corrected ADR form will be issued. (car)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (car)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Sharon Phillips. (Bather, Phillip)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sharon Phillips. (Bather, Phillip)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Certification & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sharon Phillips, (Bather, Phillip)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23754795 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Sharon Phillips. (Attorney Phillip S Bather added to party Sharon Phillips(pty:pla))(Bather, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharon Phillips v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Nicole Y Blohm
Represented By: Heather E Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Phillips
Represented By: Phillip S Bather
Represented By: Frank N Darras
Represented By: Susan B Grabarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?