Anna Kihagi et al v. Umpqua Bank et al
Plaintiff: XELAN PROP 1, LLC and Anna Kihagi
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, Umpqua Bank and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04284
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Change of Address. Other error(s) with document(s): Also, see court's website for form: Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Infromation G-06. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Notice of Change of Address filed by Plaintiff Anna Kihagi. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-04284 CJC(MRWx). (rn)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Umpqua Bank. (ghap)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Anna Kihagi, XELAN PROP 1, LLC. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Anna Kihagi, XELAN PROP 1, LLC, identifying Anna Kihagi, XELAN PROP 1, LLC, and Umpqua Bank. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Boris Treyzon counsel for Plaintiffs Anna Kihagi, XELAN PROP 1, LLC. Adding Douglas Rochen as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Anna Kihagi and XELAN PROP 1, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Anna Kihagi and XELAN PROP 1, LLC. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Anna Kihagi, XELAN PROP 1, LLC. (Treyzon, Boris)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23755144 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Anna Kihagi, XELAN PROP 1, LLC. (Attorney Boris Treyzon added to party Anna Kihagi(pty:pla), Attorney Boris Treyzon added to party XELAN PROP 1, LLC(pty:pla))(Treyzon, Boris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anna Kihagi et al v. Umpqua Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XELAN PROP 1, LLC
Represented By: Boris Treyzon
Represented By: Douglas A Rochen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Kihagi
Represented By: Boris Treyzon
Represented By: Douglas A Rochen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umpqua Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?