Arturo Penaloza-Valdez et al v. FCA US LLC et al

Plaintiff: Ofelia Hernandez and Arturo Penaloza-Valdez
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04312
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets the following: Mediation Cutoff October 18, 2019, Post-Mediation Status Conference October 21, 2019 at 8:30 a.m., Discovery Cutoff November 15, 2019, Expert Discovery Cutoff December 20, 2019, Motion Hearing Cutoff January 23, 2020, Pretrial Conference February 20, 2020 at 8:30 a.m., Jury Trial March 3, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. No further amendments allowed; compliance with FRCP 16 is required. The parties are referred to ADR Procedure No. 3: Private Mediation. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (bm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney George Tony Semaan counsel for Plaintiffs Ofelia Hernandez, Arturo Penaloza-Valdez. Adding George Semaan as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs Arturo Penaloza- Valdez and Ofelia Hernandez. (Attorney George Tony Semaan added to party Ofelia Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney George Tony Semaan added to party Arturo Penaloza-Valdez(pty:pla))(Semaan, George)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski counsel for Plaintiffs Ofelia Hernandez, Arturo Penaloza-Valdez. Adding Daniel Kalinowski as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Arturo Penaloza-Valdez and Ofelia Hernandez. (Attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski added to party Ofelia Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Max Kalinowski added to party Arturo Penaloza-Valdez(pty:pla))(Kalinowski, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-4 Days, filed by Plaintiffs Ofelia Hernandez, Arturo Penaloza-Valdez.. (Colon, Maite)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Maite Christine Colon counsel for Plaintiffs Ofelia Hernandez, Arturo Penaloza-Valdez. Adding Maite Colon as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Arturo Penaloza-Valdez and Ofelia Hernandez. (Attorney Maite Christine Colon added to party Ofelia Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Maite Christine Colon added to party Arturo Penaloza-Valdez(pty:pla))(Colon, Maite)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for July 8, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than June 24, 2019. See Local Rule 26-1. (lom)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Charles F. Eick. New Case Number 2:19-cv-04312-GW-Ex. (car)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Filed in State Court on 5/16/2019 Submitted with attachment 2 to notice of removal #1 (car)
May 16, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, FCA US LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Ofelia Hernandez, Arturo Penaloza-Valdez. Filed in State Court on 4/11/19 Submitted with attachment 1 to notice of removal #1 (car)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA North America Holdings, LLC; Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.. (Chung, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Chung, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County, Superior Court of California, case number 19STCV12566 Receipt No: 0973-23750879 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Michael Chung added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Chung, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arturo Penaloza-Valdez et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ofelia Hernandez
Represented By: Amy-Lyn Morse
Represented By: Steve Mikhov
Represented By: George Tony Semaan
Represented By: Maite Christine Colon
Represented By: Daniel Max Kalinowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Penaloza-Valdez
Represented By: Amy-Lyn Morse
Represented By: Steve Mikhov
Represented By: George Tony Semaan
Represented By: Maite Christine Colon
Represented By: Daniel Max Kalinowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Michael Chung
Represented By: Richard L Stuhlbarg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?