Nunez Aviles et al v. FCA US LLC et al

Plaintiff: Hanzel Nunez and Yamil Nunez Aviles
Defendant: FCA US LLC, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04329
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Yamil Nunez Aviles.. (Romano, Mark)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David L Brandon counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding David L. Brandon as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attorney David L Brandon added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Brandon, David)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michelle Judy Droeger counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Michelle J. Droeger is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Droeger, Michelle)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Hearing: No Hearing/Under Submission. Joint Report Due: August 2, 2019. This case has been assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt. This Order applies to all parties in this action, whether or not they are represented by counsel. Counsel, as used in this Order, also refers to parties who are representing themselves. If plaintiff has not already served the complaint (or any amendment thereto) on each defendant, plaintiff shall promptly do so and file proofs of service within three (3) days thereafter. Defendant(s) also shall timely serve and file their responsive pleadings and file proofs of service within three (3) days thereafter. See order for details. (shb)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT. See order for details. (shb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other) #4 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Document No. 4. The correct event is Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
May 17, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(lh)
May 17, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Yamil Nunez Aviles, Hanzel Nunez, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Person Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/03/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (lh)
May 17, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, FCA US LLC. Filed by Plaintiffs Yamil Nunez Aviles, Hanzel Nunez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/16/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Hanson, Erin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Erin E. Hanson re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Hanson, Erin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Hanson, Erin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV13040 Receipt No: 0973-23763682 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attorney Erin Elizabeth Hanson added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hanson, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez Aviles et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Hanson
Represented By: David L Brandon
Represented By: Dean A Olson
Represented By: Michelle Judy Droeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanzel Nunez
Represented By: Aliaksandra Valitskaya
Represented By: Timothy Michael Whelan
Represented By: Mark P Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yamil Nunez Aviles
Represented By: Aliaksandra Valitskaya
Represented By: Timothy Michael Whelan
Represented By: Mark P Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?