Ernestina Dominguez v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Ernestina Dominguez
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv04342
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-4342 on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Jean M Turk added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Turk, Jean)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Cho, Young)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ernestina Dominguez, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/11/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cho, Young)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (CROSS MEMORANDA FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service no later than 90 days of the date of this Order. (see document for further details) (hr)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (hr)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ernestina Dominguez, (Cho, Young)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ernestina Dominguez. (Cho, Young)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Ernestina Dominguez. (Cho, Young)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ernestina Dominguez. (Cho, Young)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Ernestina Dominguez. (Attorney Young Chul Cho added to party Ernestina Dominguez(pty:pla))(Cho, Young)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ernestina Dominguez v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Jean M Turk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestina Dominguez
Represented By: Young Chul Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?