Adir International, LLC et al v. Starr Indemnity and Liability Company et al
Plaintiff: Adir International, LLC and Ron Azarkman
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Does 1 through 100, inclusive and Starr Indemnity and Liability Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv04352
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 - 7 days, filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company, Counter Claimant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company.. (Tuley, Ryan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 filed by Defendant and Counter-Claimant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company.(Tuley, Ryan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Adir International, LLC, Ron Azarkman amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiffs Adir International, LLC, Ron Azarkman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Starr Indemnity & Liability Company Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint in Underlying Action, The People of the State of California v. ADIR International LLC, et al.)(Finch, Amber)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery),, Counterclaim, #5 Plaintiffs and Counter-Defendants Adir International LLC's and Ron Azarkman's Answer to Defendant and Counter-Claimant Starr Indemnity & Liability Company's Counterclaim filed by Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants Adir International, LLC, Ron Azarkman.(Finch, Amber)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Adir International, LLC, Ron Azarkman, identifying 1) Adir International, LLC, Plaintiff, Counter-Defendant; and 2) Ron Azarkman, Plaintiff, Counter-Defendant, and as trustee for the family trusts that are the only shareholders in Adir International, LLC and its managing member. (Finch, Amber)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amber S Finch counsel for Plaintiffs Adir International, LLC, Ron Azarkman. Adding T. Connor O'Carroll as counsel of record for Adir International, LLC; and Ron Azarkman for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Adir International, LLC; and Ron Azarkman. (Finch, Amber)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amber S Finch counsel for Plaintiffs Adir International, LLC, Ron Azarkman. Ashley D. Rodriguez is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Adir International, LLC; and Ron Azarkman. (Finch, Amber)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #6 served on May 29, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tuley, Ryan)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against Adir International, LLC, Ron Azarkman filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Tuley, Ryan)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap)
May 20, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Adir International, LLC, Ron Azarkman, upon Defendant Starr Indemnity and Liability Company served on 4/23/2019, answer due 5/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, CT Corporation System, Inc. Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/29/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap)
May 20, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Starr Indemnity and Liability Company., filed by plaintiffs Adir International, LLC, Ron Azarkman. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/17/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, (Tuley, Ryan)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Tuley, Ryan)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV13200 Receipt No: 0973-23768937 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan C. Tuley, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Proof of Service Summons, #4 Proof of Service) (Attorney Ryan C Tuley added to party Starr Indemnity & Liability Company(pty:dft))(Tuley, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adir International, LLC et al v. Starr Indemnity and Liability Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adir International, LLC
Represented By: David Martin Halbreich
Represented By: Ashley Della Mariko Rodriguez
Represented By: Thomas Connor O'Carroll
Represented By: Amber S Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Azarkman
Represented By: Ashley Della Mariko Rodriguez
Represented By: David Martin Halbreich
Represented By: Thomas Connor O'Carroll
Represented By: Amber S Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Ryan C Tuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company
Represented By: Kevin F Kieffer
Represented By: Michael Lee Huggins
Represented By: Ryan C Tuley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?