Benjamin Talei v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Talei
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04356
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (vv)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(Reynolds, Bryan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC answer now due 6/17/2019, filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(Reynolds, Bryan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC answer now due 6/3/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(Reynolds, Bryan)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car)
May 20, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, filed by plaintiff Benjamin Talei. Filed in State Court on 4/2/2019 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, (Reynolds, Bryan)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Reynolds, Bryan)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV11454 Receipt No: 0973-23769709 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Lease Agreement, #3 Exhibit Hakobyan - Summons & Complaint, #4 Exhibit Hakobyan Order) (Attorney Bryan A Reynolds added to party Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Reynolds, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin Talei v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Talei
Represented By: Adam Morris Rose
Represented By: Robert L Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Represented By: Bryan A Reynolds
Represented By: Brian Takahashi
Represented By: Theodore Dorenkamp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?