Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan et al v. Supervising Sound Editors, Inc.
Plaintiff: BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN, Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Health Plan, Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan and Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Individual Account Plan
Defendant: SUPERVISING SOUND EDITORS, INC., a suspended California corporation and Supervising Sound Editors, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04365
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan, Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Health Plan, Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Individual Account Plan, upon Defendant Supervising Sound Editors, Inc. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Benjamin Doe, employee in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Schmidt, Lauren)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Supervising Sound Editors, Inc. (car)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (car)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN, (Schmidt, Lauren)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN. (Schmidt, Lauren)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by PLAINTIFF BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN. (Schmidt, Lauren)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23770565 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Lauren E Schmidt added to party BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN(pty:pla))(Schmidt, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan et al v. Supervising Sound Editors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPERVISING SOUND EDITORS, INC., a suspended California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervising Sound Editors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN
Represented By: Lauren E Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Health Plan
Represented By: Lauren E Schmidt
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Kathryn Jane Halford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan
Represented By: Lauren E Schmidt
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Kathryn Jane Halford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Individual Account Plan
Represented By: Lauren E Schmidt
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Kathryn Jane Halford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?