James Rice v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: James Rice
Defendant: DOES 1 - 25, Transamerica Life Insurance Company and Does 1 through 25
Case Number: 2:2019cv04369
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #10 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The July 8, 2019 scheduling conference in this matter is hereby vacated. If necessary, the scheduling conference will instead take place on August 12, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. (iv)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference from July 8, 2019 to August 12, 2019 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #9 filed by defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Choi, Kathleen)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 7/8/2019 at 11:00 AM. (iv)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company identifying Commonwealth General Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Choi, Kathleen)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
May 20, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/17/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-8)(lh)
May 20, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT #1 plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of Transamerica, a New York Corporation and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Transamerica Corporation, filed by Plaintiff James Rice. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/28/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1 #1 )(lh)
May 20, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 25, Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff James Rice. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/13/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-3 #1 ) (lh)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Hannah Radloff re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Choi, Kathleen)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Mark Polking re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Choi, Kathleen)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Choi, Kathleen)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 18STCV04772 Receipt No: 0973-23771278 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Amendment to Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Amended Summons), #3 Exhibit C (Complaint), #4 Exhibit D (Notice of Case Assignment), #5 Exhibit E (Civil Case Cover Sheet), #6 Exhibit F (Volunatry Efficient Litigation Stipulations), #7 Exhibit G (ADR Information Packet), #8 Exhibit H (Answer to Complaint)) (Attorney Kathleen J Choi added to party Transamerica Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Choi, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Rice v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 - 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen J Choi
Represented By: Katessa C Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rice
Represented By: Carl Edwin Douglas
Represented By: Jamon R Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?