Brian Thompson v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Brian Thompson
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2019cv04454
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, identifying Life Insurance Company of North America ("LINA"), Connecticut General Corporation, Cigna Holdings,, Inc., Cigna Corporation, Cigna Holding Company. (Blohm, Nicole)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Nicole Y Blohm added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Blohm, Nicole)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Court's Standing Order filed by Plaintiff Brian Thompson. (Bather, Phillip)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 7/18/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Kristin Kyle De Bautista added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(De Bautista, Kristin)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (vv)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Thompson, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz of CT Corporation Registered Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bather, Phillip)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (ghap)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Brian Thompson. (Bather, Phillip)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Thompson. (Bather, Phillip)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Certification & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Thompson, (Bather, Phillip)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23786541 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Brian Thompson. (Attorney Phillip S Bather added to party Brian Thompson(pty:pla))(Bather, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Thompson v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Thompson
Represented By: Phillip S Bather
Represented By: Frank N Darras
Represented By: Susan B Grabarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Kristin Kyle De Bautista
Represented By: Nicole Y Blohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?