James Johnson v. Swift Transportation Inc. et al

Plaintiff: James Johnson
Defendant: Swift Transportation Inc., an Arizona Corporation, Does 1 through 20, inclusive and Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2019cv04455
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets the following: Discovery cut-off 1/17/2020. Motions due by 3/16/2020. Last date to conduct mediation is 12/13/2019. Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Jury Trial set for 4/28/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7, filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona.. (Blank, Stacey)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona.(Blank, Stacey)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for July 8, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than June 24, 2019. See Local Rule 26-1. (lom)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car)
May 22, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff James Johnson. Filed in State Court on 4/23/19 Submitted with Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Inc., an Arizona Corporation. (Blank, Stacey)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Inc., an Arizona Corporation, (Blank, Stacey)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Inc., an Arizona Corporation. (Blank, Stacey)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV14077 Receipt No: 0973-23786599 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Swift Transportation Inc., an Arizona Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rachel Monte in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Stacey F. Blank in Support of Notice of Removal) (Attorney Stacey Friedman Blank added to party Swift Transportation Inc., an Arizona Corporation(pty:dft))(Blank, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Johnson v. Swift Transportation Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Johnson
Represented By: Jonathan Pierre LaCour
Represented By: Lisa Sidney Noveck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Inc., an Arizona Corporation
Represented By: Stacey Friedman Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona
Represented By: Kevin D Smith
Represented By: Stacey Friedman Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?