Scott Barnes v. GreatCall, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Scott Barnes
Defendant: Best Buy, Co., Inc., GreatCall, Inc. and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2019cv04457
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Scott Barnes. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Beligan, Jerusalem)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING TO APPROVE JOINT STIPULATION FOR RELIEF FROM L.R. 23-3 AND A STAY ON DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' CLRA NOTICE [filed 5/6/2019; Docket No. #12 ] by Judge John F. Walter. The Court DECLINES to approve the Stipulation. (iv)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION for Order for Relief From L.R. 23-3 and a Stay on Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' CLRA Notice filed by Plaintiff Scott Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Beligan, Jerusalem)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Scott Barnes Re CLRA Venue filed by Plaintiff Scott Barnes. (Beligan, Jerusalem)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Best Buy, Co., Inc. (esa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant GreatCall, Inc. (esa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Scott Barnes, identifying Defendant GreatCall, Inc., and Defendant Best Buy, Co., Inc.. (Beligan, Jerusalem)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Scott Barnes. (Beligan, Jerusalem)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Scott Barnes. (Beligan, Jerusalem)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Scott Barnes. (Beligan, Jerusalem)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23786905 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Scott Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Jerusalem F Beligan added to party Scott Barnes(pty:pla))(Beligan, Jerusalem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott Barnes v. GreatCall, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Barnes
Represented By: Jerusalem F Beligan
Represented By: Ian M Silvers
Represented By: Brian D Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy, Co., Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M Young
Represented By: Chelsea N Mutual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GreatCall, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M Young
Represented By: Chelsea N Mutual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?