Rikke Christensen v. Shiseido Americas Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Rikke Christensen
Defendant: Shiseido Americas Corporation, Bare Escentuals Beauty, Inc., Gabriella Mervis, Ryan Stephens and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04468
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 Receipt of Remand by Los Angeles County Superior Court on 7/2/19 (lc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court, No.19STCV11689. (lc)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO REMAND ACTION TO THE LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT #18 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: stipulation is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is withdrawn #12 . All pre-trial dates and deadlines are hereby vacated and the above-entitled lawsuit is hereby remanded to the Superior Court for the State of California, County of Los Angeles, No. 19STCV11689.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Shiseido Americas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Paisan, Sean)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 The hearing on the MOTION TO REMAND #12 , scheduled for July 1, 2019 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 16, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 filed by Plaintiff Rikke Christensen. (Sethi, Rahul)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 filed by Defendant Shiseido Americas Corporation. (Yim, Tiffany)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tiffany E Yim counsel for Defendant Shiseido Americas Corporation. Adding Tiffany E. Yim as counsel of record for Shiseido Americas Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Shiseido Americas Corporation. (Attorney Tiffany E Yim added to party Shiseido Americas Corporation(pty:dft))(Yim, Tiffany)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Rikke Christensen. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sethi, Rahul)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff Rikke Christensen. Motion set for hearing on 7/1/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Sethi, Rahul)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 8/5/19 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa)
May 22, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Shiseido Americas Corporation. (Filed in state court 5/22/19, submitted as document 6, attachment 3)(esa)
May 22, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Bare Escentuals Beauty, Inc., Does, Gabriella Mervis, Shiseido Americas Corporation, Ryan Stephens, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Rikke Christensen. (Filed in state court 4/4/19, submitted as document 6, attachment 1) (esa)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of JASON ALEXANDER re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Shiseido Americas Corporation. (Garcia, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of DAVID A. GARCIA re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Shiseido Americas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A - COMPLAINT, #2 EXHIBIT B - SUMMONS, #3 EXHIBIT C - ANSWER, #4 EXHIBIT D - FEDERAL COURT MANAGEMENT STATISTICS)(Garcia, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Shiseido Americas Corporation, (Garcia, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Shiseido Americas Corporation. (Garcia, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Shiseido Americas Corporation (Garcia, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Shiseido Americas Corporation. (Garcia, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV11689 Receipt No: 0973-23788530 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Shiseido Americas Corporation. (Attorney David Augustus Garcia added to party Shiseido Americas Corporation(pty:dft))(Garcia, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rikke Christensen v. Shiseido Americas Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiseido Americas Corporation
Represented By: David Augustus Garcia
Represented By: Tiffany E Yim
Represented By: Sean Paisan
Represented By: Evan R Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bare Escentuals Beauty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriella Mervis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rikke Christensen
Represented By: Rahul Sethi
Represented By: Ben J Galante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?