Pamela Reid v. Police Department of Whittier et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Reid
Defendant: Does 1-10, Officer S. Johnson, The City of Whittier, Police Department of Whittier and Jeff A. Piper
Case Number: 2:2019cv04481
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order re Notice (Other) #18 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Request for One Day Extension)(Kelly, Christine)
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES RE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ONE DAY EXTENSION OF TIME OVER JULY 3, 2019 DEADLINE TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DKT. 18]) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please take notice that pursuant to Local Rule 5-4 and/or the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the following deficiency(ies) has been found with your electronically filed document: Pursuant to L.R. 52-4.1, a proposed order shall be e-filed as a separate attachment to any document seeking Court approval. Counsel shall file a "Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order Re..." with the proposed order e-filed as an attachment to the notice by July 16, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - select - Motions and Related Filings - select - Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Request - select - Request - select Extension of Time to File Document and Attach the Request. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
July 4, 2019 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Pamela Reid(Kelly, Christine)
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ONE DAY EXTENSION OF TIME OVER JULY 3, 2019 DEADLINE TO FILE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Pamela Reid. (Kelly, Christine)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request for ADR Procedure No. 1 - (ADR-1) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 1 filed. Parties request to Appear Before Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for settlement proceedings. Filed by Defendants S. Johnson, Jeff A. Piper, Police Department of Whittier, The City of Whittier.(Rocawich, Denise)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Defendants S. Johnson, Jeff A. Piper, Police Department of Whittier, The City of Whittier.. (Rocawich, Denise)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO FILE JOINT RULE 16(b)/26(f) REPORT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order and the order setting the scheduling conference in this matter (Dkt. 9 ), the Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report ("Report") was to have been filed no later than June 24, 2019. No Report has been filed. The parties shall file the Report, along with the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates ("Schedule") attached as Exhibit A, no later than June 26, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (DKT. 12) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. 1. Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint no later than July 3, 2019; 2. Defendants City of Whittier, Whittier Police Department, Officer Johnson and Chief Piper will file their response to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint on or before July 23, 2019; and 3. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Dkt. 8) is MOOT; 4. The Scheduling Conference is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and a scheduling order will be issued; and 5. There is no appearance required by counsel on July 1, 2019. (shb)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants S. Johnson, Jeff A. Piper, Police Department of Whittier, The City of Whittier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Joint Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint)(Rocawich, Denise)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Pamela Reid. Regarding Chamber Doc #10 (Kelly, Christine)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Pursuant to this Court's Order of June 3, 2019 (Dkt. 9 ), a response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint (the "Motion") (Dkt. #8 ) was due no later than June 10, 2019. No Opposition has been filed. The Court directs Plaintiff to file any Opposition to the Motion no later than June 13, 2019. Plaintiff shall also file a separate Request, by the same deadline, to file such Opposition. The Request shall explain the reason for untimely filing and why the Court should accept the late filing. The Court will determine whether the Request will be granted at the hearing, or in its ruling should it determine that a hearing is not necessary. If an Opposition is filed by June 13, 2019, any corresponding Reply shall be filed no later than June 19, 2019. If an Opposition and Request are not each filed by June 13, 2019, the Motion will be deemed unopposed and the Court will make its determination upon the papers that have been submitted. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT (DKT. #8 ) AND SETTING HEARING ON SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (DKT. #7 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, advances the Motion from September 30, 2019 to July 1, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. Any opposition shall be filed by June 10, 2019, with the reply to be filed no later than June 17, 2019. A hearing on the Scheduling Conference is also set for July 1, 2019 at 8:30 am. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report no later than June 24, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants S. Johnson, Jeff A. Piper, Police Department of Whittier, The City of Whittier. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) (Rocawich, Denise)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Scheduling Conference Hearing: No Hearing / Under Submission; Joint Report Due: August 2, 2019. (lom)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. (lom)
May 23, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, S. Johnson, Jeff A. Piper, Police Department of Whittier, The City of Whittier. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Pamela Reid. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/19/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED PAGE 5 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying City of Whittier, Whittier Police Department, Whittier Police Officer Johnson, Whittier Police Chief Piper, Pamela Reid. (Rocawich, Denise)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Officer S. Johnson #895, Police Department of Whittier, The City of Whittier, Whittier Police Chief Piper. (Rocawich, Denise)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Supeior Court, case number 18STCV01676 Receipt No: 0973-23790699 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Officer S. Johnson #895, The City of Whittier, Police Department of Whittier, Whittier Police Chief Piper. (Attorney Denise L Rocawich added to party Officer S. Johnson #895(pty:dft), Attorney Denise L Rocawich added to party Police Department of Whittier(pty:dft), Attorney Denise L Rocawich added to party The City of Whittier(pty:dft), Attorney Denise L Rocawich added to party Whittier Police Chief Piper(pty:dft))(Rocawich, Denise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pamela Reid v. Police Department of Whittier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer S. Johnson
Represented By: James R Touchstone
Represented By: Denise L Rocawich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Whittier
Represented By: James R Touchstone
Represented By: Denise L Rocawich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Department of Whittier
Represented By: James R Touchstone
Represented By: Denise L Rocawich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff A. Piper
Represented By: James R Touchstone
Represented By: Denise L Rocawich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Reid
Represented By: Christine Louise Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?