First Choice Laboratory v. Navegar Network Alliance, LLC
Petitioner: First Choice Laboratory
Respondent: Navegar Network Alliance, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04658
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson, Related to: Order, #13 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDICATED, AND DECREED that judgment is entered as follows: 1. The Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Final Award (the "Final Award") issued in Los Angeles, California on May 23, 2019, by Arbitrator Hon. Burton S. Katz of the American Arbitration Association, against Respondent Navegar Network Alliance, LLC f/k/a Navigant Network Alliance, LLC ("Navegar") and in favor of Petitioner First Choice is confirmed in all respects; 2. Against Navegar and in favor of First Choice for breach of contract, in the amount of $18,000,000; (see document for additional sums). (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mrgo)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD by Judge Percy Anderson, re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 9, 13, it is hereby ORDERED: 1. The Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Final Award (the "Final Award") issued in Los Angeles, California on May 23, 2019, by Arbitrator Hon. Burton S. Katz of the American Arbitration Association, against Respondent Navegar Network Alliance, LLC f/k/a Navigant Network Alliance, LLC ("Navegar"), is confirmed in all respects; 2. Judgment shall be entered forthwith in conformity with the Final Award. (mrgo)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Petitioner First Choice Laboratoryto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #11 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Russell L. Kitchen, #2 Declaration of S. Albert Wang and Exhibits 1-12, #3 Certificate of Service)(May, Aaron)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. Petitioner is ordered to show cause in writing, on or before July 19, 2019 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The failure to timely respond to this Order or to establish this Court's subject matter jurisdiction will result in the dismissal of this action without further warning. (mrgo)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT of Navegar's Failure to Respond re Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Petitioner First Choice Laboratory re: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Albert Wang, #2 Certificate of Service)(May, Aaron)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court is in receipt of a Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (Docket No. 1) filed by petitioner First Choice Laboratory ("Petitioner"), which Petitioner states is unopposed. Petitioner has filed a Certificate of Service of Initial Case Documents indicating that respondent Navegar Network Alliance, LLC ("Respondent") was served by mail on May 29, 2019. (Docket No. 5.) Respondent shall file any opposition or notice of non-opposition to the Petition on or before June 24, 2019. If Respondent files an opposition, then Petitioner may file a reply no later than July 1, 2019. The Court will inform the parties if it finds that a hearing is necessary. (mrgo)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner First Choice Laboratory, of Initial Case Documents served on May 29, 2019. (May, Aaron)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Petitioner First Choice Laboratory identifying First Choice Laboratory as Corporate Parent. (May, Aaron)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner First Choice Laboratory, identifying Brian Campbell; Charles Madden; Estate of James Towe, Jr.; Harry Suters. (May, Aaron)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner First Choice Laboratory. (May, Aaron)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award and Supporting Memorandum Receipt No: 0973-23821540 - Fee: $400, filed by Petitioner First Choice Laboratory. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation of the Parties and Exhibits A-D, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Judgment) (Attorney Aaron M May added to party First Choice Laboratory(pty:pet))(May, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Choice Laboratory v. Navegar Network Alliance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Navegar Network Alliance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: First Choice Laboratory
Represented By: Shanyah Albert Wang
Represented By: Aaron M May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?