Juanita Jackson v. Compass Group USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Juanita Jackson
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc., Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Compass Group USA, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Compass Healthcare and Morrison Healthcare
Case Number: 2:2019cv04678
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #9 filed by Plaintiff Juanita Jackson. (Harrison, Todd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #9 filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lonnie D. Giamela ISO Opposition, #2 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Opposition)(Oki, Kelly)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Juanita Jackson. Motion set for hearing on 8/5/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brennan S. Kahn in Support of Motion to Remand Action to State Court, #2 Proposed Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court) (Harrison, Todd)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 02:00 PM. (wm)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
May 29, 2019 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/25/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
May 29, 2019 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Compass Group USA, Inc., Does 1 through 10, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Juanita Jackson. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/4/20/19 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc. identifying Compass Group PLC as Corporate Parent. (Oki, Kelly)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Compass Group USA, Inc., identifying Juanita Jackson; Compass Group USA, Inc.; and Compass Group, PLC. (Oki, Kelly)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Oki, Kelly)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV08979 Receipt No: 0973-23822973 - Fee: $400, filed by DEFENDANT Compass Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelly N. Oki, #2 Declaration of Stephanie Smith) (Attorney Kelly Nicole Oki added to party Compass Group USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Oki, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juanita Jackson v. Compass Group USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Nicole Oki
Represented By: Lonnie D Giamela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Group USA, Inc. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Compass Healthcare and Morrison Healthcare
Represented By: Lonnie D Giamela
Represented By: Kelly Nicole Oki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Jackson
Represented By: Todd H Harrison
Represented By: Brennan S Kahn
Represented By: Jennifer S Baskaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?