Richard Dalton v. Anovos Productions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Dalton
Defendant: Disney Lucasfilm Ltd., NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Anovos Productions, LLC and CBS Studios, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04821
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ON STIPULATION #25 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants to respond to the original complaint in this action is extended to August 7, 2019. (lom)
July 31, 2019 Filing 25 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Anovos Productions, LLC answer now due 8/7/2019; CBS Studios, Inc. answer now due 8/7/2019; Disney Lucasfilm Ltd. answer now due 8/7/2019; NBCUniversal Media, LLC answer now due 8/7/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Richard Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin R. Duck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Dalton, designating Seyed Abbas Kazerounian as local counsel #23 . (iv)
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin R. Duck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Dalton (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 6/28/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24001651) filed by Plaintiff Richard Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Kazerounian, Seyed)
July 2, 2019 Filing 22 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Richard Dalton, upon Defendant CBS Studios, Inc. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana)
July 2, 2019 Filing 21 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Richard Dalton, upon Defendant Disney Lucasfilm Ltd. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON STIPULATION #16 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The deadline for Plaintiff to file the motion for class certification will be set by the Court at the initial 16(b)/26(f) Scheduling Conference. (iv)
June 28, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin R. Duck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Dalton (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24001651) #17 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by July 8, 2019. (lt)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin R. Duck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Dalton (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24001651) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lt)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 ** STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS DATED 6/28/19 ** APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin R. Duck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Dalton (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24001651) filed by Plaintiff Richard Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Hart, Yana) Modified on 7/1/2019 (lt).
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion to File Class Certification (LR 23-3) filed by Plaintiff Richard Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brianna Dahlberg counsel for Defendant Anovos Productions, LLC. Adding Brianna Dahlberg as counsel of record for Anovos Productions, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Anovos Productions, LLC. (Attorney Brianna Dahlberg added to party Anovos Productions, LLC(pty:dft))(Dahlberg, Brianna)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Anovos Productions, LLC answer now due 7/31/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Anovos Productions, LLC.(Rome, Eugene)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Anovos Productions, LLC, (Rome, Eugene)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eugene Rome counsel for Defendant Anovos Productions, LLC. Adding Eugene Rome as counsel of record for Anovos Productions, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Anovos Productions, LLC. (Attorney Eugene Rome added to party Anovos Productions, LLC(pty:dft))(Rome, Eugene)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian counsel for Plaintiff Richard Dalton. Adding Seyed Abbas Kazerounian as counsel of record for Richard Dalton for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Richard Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Seyed)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Yana A Hart counsel for Plaintiff Richard Dalton. Adding Yana A. Hart as counsel of record for Richard Dalton for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Richard Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-04821 MWF(KSx). (rn)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-04821 MWF(FFMx). (rn)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Anovos Productions, LLC, CBS Studios, Inc., Disney Lucasfilm Ltd., and NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (jtil)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (jtil)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Richard Dalton. (Attachments: #1 Summons for CBS Studios, Inc., #2 Summons for Disney Lucasfilm, Ltd., #3 Summons for NBCUniversal Media, LLC)(Swigart, Joshua)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Richard Dalton, (Swigart, Joshua)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Richard Dalton. (Swigart, Joshua)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23848158 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Richard Dalton. (Attorney Joshua B Swigart added to party Richard Dalton(pty:pla))(Swigart, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Dalton v. Anovos Productions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney Lucasfilm Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anovos Productions, LLC
Represented By: Brianna Dahlberg
Represented By: Eugene Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Studios, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dalton
Represented By: Joshua B Swigart
Represented By: Kevin R Duck
Represented By: Yana A Hart
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?