Elizabeth L. Greenwood v. City of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth L Greenwood and Elizabeth L. Greenwood
Defendant: Cory Brente, Michael N Feuer, City of Los Angeles and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04823
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Courtt. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Central District. Case number: 19STCV02469. (jp)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING MOTION for Leave to Amend and GRANTING Motion to Remand #10 . The Case is REMANDED to the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT AND TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF JANELLE L. MENGES IN SUPPORT THEREOF #10 filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood. (Eskridge, Gayle)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT AND TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF JANELLE L. MENGES IN SUPPORT THEREOF #10 filed by Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Michael N Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - part 1, #3 Exhibit B - part 2)(Cho, Marvin)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Allow Defendants an Extension of Time to File Initial Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #11 is due 8/7/2019. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 7, 2019 re Amended Complaint, filed by defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Michael N Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peracchio, Paloma)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT AND TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF JANELLE L. MENGES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood. Motion set for hearing on 7/22/2019 at 01:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order) (Eskridge, Gayle)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Allow Defendants an Extension of Time to File Initial Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #8 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to City of Los Angeles answer now due 7/8/2019; Cory Brente answer now due 7/8/2019; Michael N Feuer answer now due 7/8/2019, re Amended Complaint, filed by defendants City of Los Angeles; Cory Brente; Michael N Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peracchio, Paloma)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
June 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood, upon Defendant Cory Brente served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon 200 N Main Street, 6th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90012 in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/11/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C-14 PAGE 783) (ghap)
June 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood, upon Defendant Michael N Feuer served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Valdivia Deputy Clerk (Authorized to Accept) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/11/209 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C-13 PAGE 781) (ghap)
June 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood, upon Defendant Office of The Los Angeles City Attorney Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Valdivia Deputy Clerk (Authorized to Accept) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/11/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C-12 PAGE 778) (ghap) Modified on 6/4/2019 (ghap).
June 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood, upon Defendant City of Los Angeles served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Caroline Peters Deputy Clerk (Authorized to Accept) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/11/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C-11 PAGE 775) (ghap) Modified on 6/4/2019 (ghap).
June 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Michael N Feuer. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/4/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C-3 PAGE 443)(ghap)
June 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Michael N Feuer. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/25/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B 282) (ghap)
June 3, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT against Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Michael N Feuer amending Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by plaintiff Elizabeth L. Greenwood. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/21/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A PAGE 4)(ghap) Modified on 6/4/2019 (ghap).
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Michael N Feuer, (Cho, Marvin)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Marvin C. Cho re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Michael N Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - part 1, #2 Exhibit A - part 2, #3 Exhibit B - part 1, #4 Exhibit B - part 2, #5 Exhibit C - part 1, #6 Exhibit C - part 2, #7 Exhibit C - part 3, #8 Certificate of Service)(Cho, Marvin)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Cory Brente, City of Los Angeles, Michael N Feuer. (Cho, Marvin)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Calfornia, County of Los Angeles, case number 19STCV02469 Receipt No: 0973-23848620 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Cory Brente, Michael N Feuer. (Attorney Marvin Chan Cho added to party Cory Brente(pty:dft), Attorney Marvin Chan Cho added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Marvin Chan Cho added to party Michael N Feuer(pty:dft))(Cho, Marvin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elizabeth L. Greenwood v. City of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth L Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth L. Greenwood
Represented By: Gayle Lenore Eskridge
Represented By: Jacqueline Marie Wade
Represented By: Janelle Lynn Menges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Brente
Represented By: Marvin Chan Cho
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Represented By: Paloma P Peracchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael N Feuer
Represented By: Marvin Chan Cho
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Represented By: Paloma P Peracchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Marvin Chan Cho
Represented By: Susan E Coleman
Represented By: Paloma P Peracchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?