Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan et al v. TNC Productions PTE. LTD. Safe Zone Productions PTE. LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, Board of Trustees of the Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund, Board of Directors of the Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan and Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund
Defendant: TNC Productions PTE. LTD. Safe Zone Productions PTE. LTD., Markus Barmettler and Facing East Entertainment, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04849
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #13 as to Defendant Facing East Entertainment, LLC. (bm)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,, #13 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Directors of the Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, Board of Trustees of the Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund, Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund. (McDonough, Katherine)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Markus Barmettler, TNC Productions PTE. LTD. Safe Zone Productions PTE. LTD., Facing East Entertainment, LLC, A California Limited Liability Company amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, Board of Trustees of the Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund, Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund, Board of Directors of the Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(McDonough, Katherine)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO THE COURT OF FOREIGN DEFENDANT AND REQUEST FOR TIME FOR SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Board of Directors of the Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, Board of Trustees of the Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund, Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(McDonough, Katherine)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, Board of Trustees of the Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund, Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund, Board of Directors of the Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, upon Defendant TNC Productions PTE. LTD. Safe Zone Productions PTE. LTD. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Miguel "Doe" person authorized to accept service on behalf of Marc Jacobson (Agent) in compliance with statute not specified by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (McDonough, Katherine)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Markus Barmettler. (lh)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant TNC Productions PTE. LTD. Safe Zone Productions PTE. LTD. (lh)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Board of Directors of the Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, Board of Trustees of the Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund, Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, Writers' Guild-Industry Health Fund, (McDonough, Katherine)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Directors of the Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, Board of Trustees of the Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund, Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, Writers' Guild-Industry Health Fund. (McDonough, Katherine)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Directors of the Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, Board of Trustees of the Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund, Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, Writers' Guild-Industry Health Fund. (McDonough, Katherine)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Board of Directors of the Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, Board of Trustees of the Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund, Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, Writers' Guild-Industry Health Fund. (McDonough, Katherine)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23854136 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan, Board of Trustees of the Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund, Writers' Guild-Industry Health Fund, Board of Directors of the Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan. (Attorney Katherine McDonough added to party Board of Directors of the Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan(pty:pla), Attorney Katherine McDonough added to party Board of Trustees of the Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Katherine McDonough added to party Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan(pty:pla), Attorney Katherine McDonough added to party Writers' Guild-Industry Health Fund(pty:pla))(McDonough, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan et al v. TNC Productions PTE. LTD. Safe Zone Productions PTE. LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan
Represented By: Katherine McDonough
Represented By: Jessica Natalie Melgar
Represented By: George M Kraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund
Represented By: Katherine McDonough
Represented By: Jessica Natalie Melgar
Represented By: George M Kraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Directors of the Producer-Writers Guild of America Pension Plan
Represented By: Katherine McDonough
Represented By: Jessica Natalie Melgar
Represented By: George M Kraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Writers Guild-Industry Health Fund
Represented By: Katherine McDonough
Represented By: Jessica Natalie Melgar
Represented By: George M Kraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TNC Productions PTE. LTD. Safe Zone Productions PTE. LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markus Barmettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facing East Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?