Douglas Wilber, et al v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: FAITH WILBUR, DOUGLAS WILBUR, Faith Wilber and Douglas Wilber
Defendant: Vigor Shipyards, Inc., AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.), Elliott Company, Foster Wheeler, LLC, Gardner Denver, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Crane Co., Blackmer Pump Company, Flowserve US Inc., General Electric Company, Aurora Pump Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Does 1 through 400, inclusive, Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, CLA-VAL Co., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, FMC Corporation, The Nash Engineering Company, ITT, LLC, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, CBS Corporation and IMO Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04940
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 54 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), as to defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (mrgo)
July 31, 2019 Filing 53 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiffs Douglas Wilber, Faith Wilber. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Face Page of Complaint)(Sandoval, Leonard)
July 31, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #51 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (mrgo)
July 30, 2019 Filing 51 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiffs Douglas Wilber, Faith Wilber. (Sandoval, Leonard)
July 25, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE DEFENDANT BW/IP, INC. AND ITS WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARIES IMPROPERLY NAMED AND SERVED AS BW/IP, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BYRON JACKSON PUMP CO.'S NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT filed by Defendant BW/IP, Inc.. (Gettas, Taline)
July 25, 2019 Filing 49 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Taline R Gettas counsel for Defendant BW/IP, Inc.. Adding Keith M. Ameele, Suzanna L. Minasian, Taline R. Gettas as counsel of record for BW/IP and its wholly owned subsidiaries for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BW/IP, Inc. and its wholly owned subsidiaries. (Gettas, Taline)
July 25, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BW/IP, Inc., identifying Flowserve Corporation. (Attorney Taline R Gettas added to party BW/IP, Inc. (pty:dft))(Gettas, Taline)
July 16, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendant FMC Corporation. [Submitted as Exhibit 1 to doc. no. 46](mrgo)
July 16, 2019 Filing 47 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Statement Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 7.1, and Civil Local Rule 7.1-1 filed by Defendant FMC Corporation (Smith, Harrison)
July 16, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by defendant FMC Corporation. (Smith, Harrison)
July 16, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Harrison Scott Smith on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Attorney Harrison Scott Smith added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Smith, Harrison)
July 16, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy C Pieper on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Attorney Timothy C Pieper added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Pieper, Timothy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 43 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Francis D Pond on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
July 11, 2019 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Castillo counsel for Defendant Flowserve US Inc.. Adding Robert Castillo as counsel of record for Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Edward Valves, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Edward Valves, Inc.. (Castillo, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING NOTICE/IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Initial Status Conference is vacated and off calendar. Jury trial is set for 12/17/2019 at 9:00 a.m., with a pretrial conference on 12/9/2019 at 3:00 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 10, 2019 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert Castillo counsel for Defendant Blackmer Pump Company. Adding Robert Castillo as counsel of record for Blackmer Pump Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Blackmer Pump Company. (Castillo, Robert)
July 10, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Blackmer Pump Company, identifying Dover Corporation. (Cunningham, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James P Cunningham counsel for Defendant Blackmer Pump Company. Adding James P. Cunningham as counsel of record for Blackmer Pump Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Blackmer Pump Company. (Attorney James P Cunningham added to party Blackmer Pump Company(pty:dft))(Cunningham, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, Notice of Filing State Court Answer filed by Defendant Blackmer Pump Company.(Attorney Robert Castillo added to party Blackmer Pump Company(pty:dft))(Castillo, Robert)
July 3, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey on behalf of Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. (Bailey, Bobbie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc., identifying Imo Industries, Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie)
July 2, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Defendant IMO Industries, Inc..(Attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey added to party IMO Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bailey, Bobbie)
June 28, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Refiling State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant CLA-VAL Co.. (Lister, John)
June 25, 2019 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Luis Alfonso Barba counsel for Defendant Aurora Pump Company. Adding Luis Alfonso Barba as counsel of record for Aurora Pump Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (Barba, Luis)
June 25, 2019 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company (Barba, Luis)
June 25, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, and Demand For Jury Trial filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company.(Attorney Luis Alfonso Barba added to party Aurora Pump Company(pty:dft))(Barba, Luis)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 7/29/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CLA-VAL Co., identifying Griswold Industries, Inc. as Corporate Parent, other affiliates The Travelers Companies, Inc., Resolute Insurance Company. (Attorney John R Lister added to party CLA-VAL Co.(pty:dft))(Lister, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorneys John R. Lister and Charles H. Kanter on behalf of defendant CLA-VAL Co.. (Lister, John)
June 19, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Submitted as Exhibit to doc. no. 22-1)(mrgo)
June 19, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine C Elford on behalf of Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Attorney Katherine C Elford added to party Honeywell International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Elford, Katherine)
June 19, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Elford, Katherine)
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Elford, Katherine)
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc., (Brosamle, Anthony)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brosamle, Anthony)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle counsel for Defendant Flowserve US Inc.. Adding Anthony D. Brosamle as counsel of record for Flowserve US Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc.. (Attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle added to party Flowserve US Inc.(pty:dft))(Brosamle, Anthony)
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Vigor Shipyards, Inc.. Amendment to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 CORRECTED NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF VIGOR SHIPYARDS, INC. UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1442(a); DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (Yaron, George)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Vigor Shipyards, Inc.. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Yaron, George)
June 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #12 , Notice of Appearance #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Defendant Vigor Shipyards, Inc.. (Steele, Demian)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE NOTICE OF NEW CASE ORDER filed by Defendant Vigor Shipyards, Inc.. (Steele, Demian)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, ANSWER OF DEFENDANT VIGOR SHIPYARDS, INC. fka TODD PACIFIC SHIPYARD CORPORATION; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Vigor Shipyards, Inc..(Steele, Demian)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amy Jo Talarico on behalf of Defendants Elliott Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., ITT, LLC (Talarico, Amy)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ITT, LLC identifying ITT Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc. identifying ITT Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certification as to Interested Parties filed by Defendant Elliott Company identifying Elliott Group Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Joseph Duffy on behalf of Defendants Elliott Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., ITT, LLC (Duffy, Joseph)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 7/15/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE of F.R.CIV.P. 7.1-1 AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Vigor Shipyards, Inc. (Steele, Demian)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
June 6, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant The Nash Engineering Company. (Filed in state court 5/30/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 4, p. 40)(esa)
June 6, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, Jury Demand, filed by defendant ITT, LLC. (Filed in state court 5/24/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 4, p. 27)(Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party ITT, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Tynnete Campbell added to party ITT, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party ITT, LLC(pty:dft))(esa)
June 6, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, Jury Demand filed by defendant Goulds Pump, Inc. (Filed in state court 5/24/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 4, p. 14)(esa)
June 6, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, Jury Demand, filed by defendant Elliott Company. (Filed in state court 5/24/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 4)(esa)
June 6, 2019 COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SUMMARY TRANSMITTAL FORM executed by Plaintiffs Faith Wilber, Douglas Wilber, upon Defendant Vigor Shipyards, Inc. served on 5/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon National Registered Agents, Inc. by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa)
June 6, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Aurora Pump Company, BW/IP, Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, CBS Corporation, CLA-VAL Co., Crane Co., Does, Elliott Company, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Inc., Foster Wheeler, LLC, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pump, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., ITT, LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, The Nash Engineering Company, Vigor Shipyards, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiffs Faith Wilber, Douglas Wilber. (Filed in state court 5/8/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19ST-CV-15971 Receipt No: 0973-23876810 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Vigor Shipyards, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint for Damages, #2 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Service of Process, #4 Exhibit Pleadings filed in State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Demian David Steele added to party Vigor Shipyards, Inc.(pty:dft))(Steele, Demian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas Wilber, et al v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAITH WILBUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS WILBUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith Wilber
Represented By: Leonard Sandoval
Represented By: Benno B Ashrafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Wilber
Represented By: Leonard Sandoval
Represented By: Benno B Ashrafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigor Shipyards, Inc.
Represented By: Demian David Steele
Represented By: George D Yaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Tynnete Campbell
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, Inc.
Represented By: Keith M Ameele
Represented By: Suzanna Lianna Minasian
Represented By: Taline R Gettas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Represented By: Robert Castillo
Represented By: James P Cunningham
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Kelly
Represented By: Robert Castillo
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Luis Alfonso Barba
Represented By: Christine D Calareso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine C Elford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Turbomachinery Co.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Tynnete Campbell
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 400, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLA-VAL Co.
Represented By: John R Lister
Represented By: Charles H Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Harrison Scott Smith
Represented By: Timothy C Pieper
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nash Engineering Company
Represented By: Whitney Barnecut
Represented By: B Gardiner McKleroy
Represented By: William M Hake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Tynnete Campbell
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Tynnete Campbell
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Olga Guadalupe Pena
Represented By: Emily Kate Doty
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?