Patricia Chang v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Chang
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC and Does 1-20, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04944
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 8/19/19 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(Takahashi, Brian)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-04944 ODW(MAAx). (rn)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
June 6, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-20, Inclusive, Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Patricia Chang. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/3/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, identifying Tata Motors Limited. (Fonseca, Freddy)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Fonseca, Freddy)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV15594 Receipt No: 0973-23877287 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Purchase Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex C - Supporting Case Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex D - Supporting Case Fee Motion) (Attorney Freddy Israel Fonseca added to party Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Fonseca, Freddy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patricia Chang v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Represented By: Freddy Israel Fonseca
Represented By: Richard L Stuhlbarg
Represented By: Brian Takahashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Chang
Represented By: Scott R Kaufman
Represented By: Eric Kyle Natenstedt
Represented By: Erika Nicolalde Kavicky
Represented By: Barak J Berlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?