Hrant Musakhanyan v. United States of America
Petitioner: Hrant Musakhanyan
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv04946
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DECLARING PARTIAL WAIVER OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE AND COMPELLING DISCLOSURE OF CERTAIN ATTORNEY-CLIENT COMMUNICATIONS #7 by Judge George H. Wu (lc)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING GOVERNMENTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2255 #6 by Judge George H. Wu: The government to respond to defendants motion is extended from June 11, 2019 to August 23, 2019. Defendants response, if any, shall be due on September 23,2019. (lc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 GOVERNMENTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR COURT ORDER DECLARING PARTIAL WAIVER OF ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE AND COMPELLING DISCLOSURE OF CERTAIN ATTORNEY-CLIENT COMMUNICATIONS filed by Respondent United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shemitz, Julie)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 8/23/2019 re Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) #1 filed by RESPONDENT United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shemitz, Julie)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Assistant United States Attorney Julie J. Shemitz on behalf of defendant United States of America. (Attorney Julie J Shemitz added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Shemitz, Julie)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT/PETITIONER'S MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE OR CORRECT SENTENCE, PURSUANT TO TITLE 28 USC 2255 by Judge George H. Wu. The Government is ordered to respond by July 11, 2019. The Petitioner will have until August 12, 2019. Said Motion will be deemed submitted upon the filing of the reply. (mrgo)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (car)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255 #1 filed by Hrant Musakhanyan. [2:16-CR-00753-GW] (car)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255 assigned to Judge George H. Wu. For docketing entries refer to CR Case # 2:16-cr-00753-GW, filed by Petitioner Hrant Musakhanyan. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hrant Musakhanyan v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hrant Musakhanyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR
Represented By: Julie J Shemitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?