Margaret J. Jones v. The United States of America

Plaintiff: Margaret J Jones
Defendant: The United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service and The United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv04950
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Margaret J Jones, upon Defendant The United States of America served on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Flabia Delarosa, Process Specialist. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Department of Justice. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons returned. Officer Agency and Attorney Generals Office served by US mail. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service by mail on US Attorney General and IRS)(Walton, Edward)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 9/9/2019. (lb)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV19-00173-JVS (RAOx). Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-04950-JVS (RAOx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna. (dv)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant The United States of America. (esa)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (esa)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Summons Request #4 filed by Plaintiff Margaret J Jones. (Walton, Edward)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Margaret J Jones. (Walton, Edward)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Margaret J Jones, (Walton, Edward)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Margaret J Jones. (Walton, Edward)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23878100 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Margaret J Jones. (Attorney Edward C Walton added to party Margaret J Jones(pty:pla))(Walton, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Margaret J. Jones v. The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret J Jones
Represented By: Edward C Walton
Represented By: Patrick W Martin
Represented By: Eric Dale Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?