Jeenal Patel v. Subaru of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeenal Patel
Defendant: Subaru of America, Inc. and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv04982
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties andtheir counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that willgovern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2020 at 10:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 4/17/2020 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 4/28/2020 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on July 15, 2019 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: December 16, 2019. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: December 20, 2019. (iv)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Jeenal Patel.. (Romano, Mark)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Timothy Whelan filed by Plaintiff Jeenal Patel. (Romano, Mark)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 15, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before July 1, 2019. (iv)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil)
June 7, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 6/5/2019, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
June 7, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Jeenal Patel in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/7/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Jury Demand #4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on June 7, 2019. (Duarte, Danielle)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc... (Duarte, Danielle)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc., identifying Subaru Corporation. (Duarte, Danielle)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc.. (Duarte, Danielle)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV15761 Receipt No: 0973-23883134 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Subaru of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Danielle Nicole Duarte added to party Subaru of America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Duarte, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeenal Patel v. Subaru of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeenal Patel
Represented By: Timothy Michael Whelan
Represented By: Mark P Romano
Represented By: Aliaksandra Valitskaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subaru of America, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle Nicole Duarte
Represented By: Jacqueline Bruce Chinery
Represented By: Kate S Lehrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?