Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd. v. Underground Toys USA, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd and Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Stephen Matthew Wozniak, Underground Toys USA, LLC, dba "SEVEN20", Does 1-10, inclusive and Underground Toys USA, LLC
Counter Defendant: Steven Yu and Sharon Shen
Case Number: 2:2019cv04993
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons Issued re Counterclaim #19 as to Counter Defendants Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd., Sharon Shen, Steven Yu. (Attachments: #1 Summon issued as to Counter Defendant Sharon Shen, #2 Summon issued as to Counter Defendant Steven Yu). (jp)
September 20, 2019 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #19 filed by Counter-Claimant Underground Toys USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Shen Summons, #2 Yu Summons)(Phillips, Laurence)
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd., Steven Yu, Sharon Shen filed by Defendants Stephen Matthew Wozniak, Underground Toys USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Laurence R Phillips added to party Underground Toys USA, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Laurence R Phillips added to party Stephen Matthew Wozniak(pty:dft))(Phillips, Laurence)
September 10, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Underground Toys USA, LLC answer now due 9/20/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Underground Toys USA, LLC.(Attorney Katlyn Gregg added to party Underground Toys USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Gregg, Katlyn)
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd.. upon Stephen Matthew Wozniak waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Laurence R. Phillips. (Matthews, Leodis)
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd.. upon Underground Toys USA, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Laurence R. Phillips. (Matthews, Leodis)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd., upon Defendant Stephen Matthew Wozniak served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kristy Petruff, Supervisor in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Matthews, Leodis)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd., upon Defendant Underground Toys USA, LLC served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kristy Petruff, Receptionist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Matthews, Leodis)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Stephen Matthew Wozniak. (jp)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Underground Toys USA, LLC. (jp)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd.. (Matthews, Leodis)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd.. (Matthews, Leodis)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 , Summons Request #5 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd. (Matthews, Leodis)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd. (Matthews, Leodis)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd, (Matthews, Leodis)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd. (Matthews, Leodis)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23886144 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd. (Attorney Leodis Clyde Matthews added to party Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd(pty:pla))(Matthews, Leodis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd. v. Underground Toys USA, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd
Represented By: Leodis Clyde Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dongguan Beibei Toys Industry Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Leodis Clyde Matthews
Represented By: Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Matthew Wozniak
Represented By: Laurence R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underground Toys USA, LLC, dba "SEVEN20"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underground Toys USA, LLC
Represented By: Katlyn Gregg
Represented By: Laurence R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Steven Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Sharon Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?