Theressa Shields et al v. Andeavor Logistics LP et al
Plaintiff: Theressa Shields
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC;, and DOES 1-50, Inclusive,, Tesoro Corporation;, Andeavor Logistics LP;, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC;, Marathon Petroleum Company LP;, Andeavor Company;, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC, Andeavor Company, Andeavor Refining and Marketing Co, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Andeavor Logistics LP, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC, Tesoro Corporation and Does 1-50, Inclusive
Petitioner: Andeavor Refining and Marketing Co;
Case Number: 2:2019cv04995
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 35 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
July 31, 2019 Filing 34 STATEMENT OF DECISION GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court is GRANTED and this action is REMANDED to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT [filed 7/5/19; Docket No. #21 ] by Judge John F. Walter. This action is hereby REMANDED to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (iv)
July 24, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court #21 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Statement of Decision Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court)(Ames, Scott)
July 22, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court #21 filed by Plaintiff Theressa Shields. (Ames, Scott)
July 19, 2019 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Melanie H Rollins counsel for Defendants Andeavor Logistics LP, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC. Darin Jones is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants ANDEAVOR LOGISTICS LP; TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING COMPANY LLC; MARATHON PETROLEUM LOGISTICS SERVICES LLC; MARATHON PETROLEUM COMPANY LP. (Rollins, Melanie)
July 19, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Melanie H Rollins counsel for Defendants Andeavor Logistics LP, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC. Adding Melanie H. Rollins as counsel of record for ANDEAVOR LOGISTICS LP; TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING COMPANY LLC; MARATHON PETROLEUM LOGISTICS SERVICES LLC; MARATHON PETROLEUM COMPANY LP for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants ANDEAVOR LOGISTICS LP; TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING COMPANY LLC; MARATHON PETROLEUM LOGISTICS SERVICES LLC; MARATHON PETROLEUM COMPANY LP. (Attorney Melanie H Rollins added to party Andeavor Logistics LP(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie H Rollins added to party Marathon Petroleum Company LP(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie H Rollins added to party Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Melanie H Rollins added to party Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC (pty:dft))(Rollins, Melanie)
July 15, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Andeavor Logistics LP, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #27 served on July 15, 2019. (Darrow, Tanja)
July 15, 2019 Filing 27 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court #21 filed by Defendants Andeavor Logistics LP, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC. (Darrow, Tanja)
July 11, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #25 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court #21 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Attachment 1 [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court)(Ames, Scott)
July 10, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Remand #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. See Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Electronic Lodging of Proposed Orders. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2020 at 10:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 5/15/2020 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 5/19/2020 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on July 22, 2019 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: January 6, 2020. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: January 10, 2020. (iv)
July 8, 2019 Filing 22 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiff Theressa Shields. (Ames, Scott)
July 5, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Theressa Shields. Motion set for hearing on 8/5/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Ames, Scott)
July 5, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Scott R. Ames re Proof of Service on Defendant Tesoro Corporation filed by Plaintiff Theressa Shields. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Tesoro Corporation Service Documents, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Tesoro Corporation Proof of Service)(Ames, Scott)
July 5, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Scott R. Ames re Proof of Service on Defendant Andeavor Refining and Marketing Co filed by Plaintiff Theressa Shields. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Andeavor Refining and Marketing Company Service Documents, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Andeavor Refining and Marketing Company Proof of Service)(Ames, Scott)
July 5, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Scott R. Ames filed by Plaintiff Theressa Shields. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Andeavor Company Service Documents, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Andeavor Company Proof of Service)(Ames, Scott)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 STATEMENT re: Local Rule 7-3 Conference filed by Plaintiff Theressa Shields (Ames, Scott)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-04995 JFW(SSx). (rn)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Theressa Shields. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Minute Order re: Scheduling Conference)(Ames, Scott)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Scott R. Ames as Lead Trial Counsel re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff Theressa Shields. (Ames, Scott)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Theressa Shields, identifying Theressa Shields. (Ames, Scott)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Lead Trial Counsel Tanja L. Darrow Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendants Andeavor Logistics LP, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC. (Darrow, Tanja)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Andeavor Logistics LP, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on June 12, 2019. (Darrow, Tanja)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for July 22, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before July 8, 2019. (iv)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Andeavor Logistics LP, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement,,,,, #5 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,, #4 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Notice of Related Case(s) #3 served on June 10, 2019. (Darrow, Tanja)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
June 7, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Andeavor Logistics LP, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC. Submitted with Attachment 4 to Notice of Removal #1 (Attorney Darin Kyle Jones added to party Andeavor Logistics LP(pty:dft), Attorney Darin Kyle Jones added to party Marathon Petroleum Company LP(pty:dft), Attorney Darin Kyle Jones added to party Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Darin Kyle Jones added to party Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC (pty:dft))(car)
June 7, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Theressa Shields, upon Defendant Marathon Petroleum Company LP served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, intake clerk at CT Corporation System, California registered agent for process service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 5/15/19 Submitted with attachment 2 to notice of removal #1 (car)
June 7, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Theressa Shields, upon Defendant Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, intake clerk at CT Corporation System, California registered agent for process service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 5/15/19 Submitted with attachment 2 to notice of removal #1 (car)
June 7, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Theressa Shields, upon Defendant Andeavor Logistics LP served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, intake clerk at CT Corporation System, California registered agent for process service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 5/15/2019 Submitted with attachment 2 to notice of removal #1 (car)
June 7, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Theressa Shields, upon Defendant Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, intake clerk at CT Corporation System, California registered agent for process service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 5/15/2019 Submitted with attachment 2 to notice of removal #1 (car)
June 7, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Andeavor Company, Andeavor Logistics LP, Andeavor Refining and Marketing Co, Does 1-50, Inclusive, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC, Tesoro Corporation, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Theressa Shields. Filed in State Court on 5/6/2019 Submitted with attachment 3 to notice of removal #1 (car)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Andeavor Logistics LP;, Marathon Petroleum Company LP;, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC;, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC; identifying Defendant ANDEAVOR LOGISTICS LP issues stock to the general public. It also has two parent companies: Tesoro Logistics GP LLC and Western Refining Southwest, Inc. Tesoro Logistics GP LLC has three parent companies: Tesoro Alaska Company LLC, Defendant TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY LLC and Western Refining Southwest, Inc. Tesoro Alaska Company LLC is a wholly owned subsidiary of Western Refining Southwest, Inc. Western Refining Southwest, Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of Marathon Petroleum Corporation. Defendant TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY LLC is a wholly owned subsidiary of Western Refining Southwest, Inc. Western Refining Southwest, Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of Marathon Petroleum Corporation. Defendant MARATHON PETROLEUM LOGISTICS SERVICES LP has two parent companies: MPC Investment LLC and Marathon Petroleum Corporation. MPC Investment LLC is a wholly owned subsidiary of Marathon Petroleum Corporation. Marathon Petroleum Corporation issues stock to the general public. It has no parent company. No publicly held corporation owns more than 10% of its stock. as Corporate Parent. (Darrow, Tanja)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Andeavor Logistics LP;, Marathon Petroleum Company LP;, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC;, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC;, identifying (1) Plaintiff Theressa Shields (2) Defendant Andeavor Logistics LP; (3) Defendant Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC; (4) Defendant Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC; (5) Defendant Marathon Petroleum Company LP; (6) Western Refining Southwest, Inc. (7) Tesoro Logistics GP; (8) Marathon Petroleum Corporation; (9) MPC Investments LLC: (10) Tesoro Logistics GP LLC; and (11) Tesoro Alaska Company LLC. (Darrow, Tanja)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Andeavor Logistics LP;, Marathon Petroleum Company LP;, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC;, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC;. Related Case(s): None (Darrow, Tanja)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Andeavor Logistics LP;, Marathon Petroleum Company LP;, Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC;, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC;. (Darrow, Tanja)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV15610 Receipt No: 0973-23886471 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC;, Andeavor Logistics LP;, Marathon Petroleum Company LP;, Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC;. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tanja L. Darrow in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal of Civil Acttion to Federal Court, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Tanja L. Darrow - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Tanja L. Darrow - Service of Process, Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and Notice of Case Management Conference and Notice of Case Assignment, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Tanja L. Darrow - Answer to Complaint, #5 Declaration of Karen Kawano in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court, #6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Karen Kawano - 2015-2019 Tesoro CBA, #7 Exhibit B to Declaration of Karen Kawano - Plaintiff's Grievance Report) (Attorney Tanja L Darrow added to party Andeavor Logistics LP;(pty:dft), Attorney Tanja L Darrow added to party Marathon Petroleum Company LP; (pty:dft), Attorney Tanja L Darrow added to party Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC; (pty:dft), Attorney Tanja L Darrow added to party Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC; (pty:dft))(Darrow, Tanja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theressa Shields et al v. Andeavor Logistics LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC;
Represented By: Tanja L Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: and DOES 1-50, Inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Corporation;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andeavor Logistics LP;
Represented By: Tanja L Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC;
Represented By: Tanja L Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LP;
Represented By: Tanja L Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andeavor Company;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Logistics Services LLC
Represented By: Darin Kyle Jones
Represented By: Melanie H Rollins
Represented By: Tanja L Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andeavor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andeavor Refining and Marketing Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LP
Represented By: Darin Kyle Jones
Represented By: Melanie H Rollins
Represented By: Tanja L Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andeavor Logistics LP
Represented By: Darin Kyle Jones
Represented By: Melanie H Rollins
Represented By: Tanja L Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC
Represented By: Darin Kyle Jones
Represented By: Melanie H Rollins
Represented By: Tanja L Darrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theressa Shields
Represented By: Scott Robert Ames
Represented By: Erin Marie Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andeavor Refining and Marketing Co;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?