Jack Cabada v. Unknown
Plaintiff: Jack Cabada
Defendant: Unknown
Case Number: 2:2019cv05043
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned addressed to Jack Cabada BA5127 Lancaster State Prison P 0 Box 9670 Lancaster, CA 93539 re Order on Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV60P) #5 (sbou)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned addressed to Jack Cabada re Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form #4 (sbou)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Denying #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. DENIED, and this case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (twdb)
June 13, 2019 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Re REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support #2 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(ch)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Jack Cabada. (ghap)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Unknown pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L Abrams., filed by plaintiff Jack Cabada. (ghap)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed CCA # 19-70774. The court is in receipt of petitioner's original petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed pursuant to 28 2254. An application for a writ of habeas corpus must be made to the district court. See Fed. R App. P. 22(a); see also 28 U.S.C. 2241(b). If a petition for writ of habeas corpus is filed in the court of appeals. "the application must be transferred to the appropriate district court" Fed. R. App. P. 22(a). Accordingly, the Clerk shall transfer the petition to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. Upon transfer of the petition, the Clerk shall close this original action. (ghap) Modified on 6/12/2019 (ghap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jack Cabada v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Cabada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?