Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Evergreen Marine UK Limited

Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: EVERGREEN MARINE (UK) LIMITED dba EVERGREEN LINE, Evergreen Marine UK Limited and DOES 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2019cv05062
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Evergreen Marine UK Limited acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Cogswell, Nakazawa, & Chang LLP, Attorney. (Cummins, Michael)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, upon Defendant Evergreen Marine UK Limited served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc. - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cummins, Michael)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Evergreen Marine UK Limited. (jtil)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (jtil)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, identifying Travelers Property Casualty Company of America; Eastman Footwear Group, Inc.. (Cummins, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Cummins, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Cummins, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23898949 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attorney Michael J Cummins added to party Travelers Property Casualty Company of America(pty:pla))(Cummins, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Evergreen Marine UK Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Michael J Cummins
Represented By: Nathaniel Merton Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERGREEN MARINE (UK) LIMITED dba EVERGREEN LINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evergreen Marine UK Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?